Mission Kayaking Nz Limited (NZBN 9429037619114) was started on 31 Mar 1999. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 16 Sutton Place, Kelvin Grove, Palmerston North, 4414 (type: registered, physical). 196 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North had been their registered address, up to 14 Feb 2017. Mission Kayaking Nz Limited used more aliases, namely: Focus 2004 Limited from 06 Apr 2004 to 30 Mar 2007, Foamation Limited (31 Mar 1999 to 06 Apr 2004). 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Fletcher, Michael David (an individual) located at Palmerston North postcode 4410. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
16 Sutton Place, Kelvin Grove, Palmerston North, 4414 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Feb 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael David Fletcher
Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 27 Feb 2013 |
Director | 31 Mar 1999 - current |
Michael David O'donnell
Masterton,
Address used since 29 Jun 2015 |
Director | 31 Mar 1999 - 31 Jan 2017 |
Murray Albert Edgecombe
Rd 10, Palmerston North, 4470
Address used since 02 Mar 2010 |
Director | 01 Apr 2007 - 16 Jun 2010 |
Lawrence Alexander Shem
Highgate, South Australia,
Address used since 01 Apr 2007 |
Director | 01 Apr 2007 - 06 Mar 2009 |
Simon Christopher Barnett
Palmerston North,
Address used since 31 Mar 1999 |
Director | 31 Mar 1999 - 26 Feb 2004 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
196 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4410 | Registered & physical | 04 Mar 2014 - 14 Feb 2017 |
Naylor Lawrence & Associates, 200 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4410 | Registered & physical | 30 Aug 2010 - 04 Mar 2014 |
Naylor Lawrence & Associates, 4th Floor, Guardian Trust House, Corner The Sq &, Main Str, Palmerston North | Registered & physical | 29 Feb 2008 - 30 Aug 2010 |
C/- Price Waterhousecoopers, 4th Floor, Civic Centre, The Square, Palmerston North | Registered | 19 Jul 2001 - 29 Feb 2008 |
C/- Price Waterhouse, 4th Floor, Civic Centre, The Square, Palmerston North | Physical | 19 Jul 2001 - 29 Feb 2008 |
4th Floor, Nzi House, Cnr The Sq & Main St, Palmerston North | Physical | 19 Jul 2001 - 19 Jul 2001 |
C/- Price Waterhouse, Civic Centre, The Square, Palmerston North | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 19 Jul 2001 |
C/- Price Waterhouse, Civic Centre, The Square, Palmerston North | Physical | 01 Mar 2000 - 19 Jul 2001 |
C/- Price Waterhouse, Civic Centre, The Square, Palmerston North | Registered | 01 Mar 2000 - 12 Apr 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fletcher, Michael David Individual |
Palmerston North 4410 |
31 Mar 1999 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Barnett, Simon Christopher Individual |
Palmerston North |
26 Feb 2004 - 26 Feb 2004 |
O'donnell, Michael David Individual |
Masterton |
31 Mar 1999 - 22 Mar 2017 |
Null - Kellhat Pty Limited Other |
12 Nov 2007 - 04 Feb 2009 | |
Shem, Lawrence Alexander Individual |
Highgate South Australia |
20 Jul 2007 - 20 Jul 2007 |
Kellhat Pty Limited Other |
12 Nov 2007 - 04 Feb 2009 |
Current Craft Limited 16 Sutton Place |
|
Voice Of Christ Full Gospel Church (palmerston North) Trust Board 28-30 Sutton Place |
|
Small Wings Limited 104 Cessna Road |
|
Telco Two Limited 2a Mihaere Drive |
|
Telcospec Limited 2a Mihaere Drive |
|
Cableguy Limited 2a Mihaere Drive |