Network Imaging Solutions Limited (issued a business number of 9429037567910) was registered on 02 Jun 1999. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Flat 4, 6 Alloy Street, Sockburn, Christchurch, 8042 (type: physical, registered). 34 Birmingham Drive, Middleton, Christchurch had been their physical address, up until 30 May 2019. Network Imaging Solutions Limited used other names, namely: Blade Investments Limited from 02 Jun 1999 to 22 Jan 2004. 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 5 shares (5 per cent of shares), namely:
Hurford, Catherine (an individual) located at Huntsbury, Christchurch postcode 8022. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 90 per cent of all shares (90 shares); it includes
Hurford, John (an individual) - located at Huntsbury, Christchurch,
Hatherly Loughnan Trustees Limited (an entity) - located at Shirley, Christchurch,
Hurford, Catherine (an individual) - located at Huntsbury, Christchurch. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (5 shares, 5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Hurford, John, located at Huntsbury, Christchurch (an individual). The Businesscheck information was last updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Flat 4, 6 Alloy Street, Sockburn, Christchurch, 8042 | Physical & registered & service | 30 May 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John Hurford
Huntsbury, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 03 Oct 2016 |
Director | 15 Aug 2005 - current |
Thomas Hurford
Springlands, Blenheim, 7201
Address used since 05 Jun 2010 |
Director | 21 Jun 1999 - 02 Jun 2014 |
John Ernest Hurford
Christchurch,
Address used since 02 Jun 1999 |
Director | 02 Jun 1999 - 21 Jun 1999 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
34 Birmingham Drive, Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 | Physical & registered | 09 Dec 2015 - 30 May 2019 |
40 Durham Street, Sydenham, Christchurch, 8023 | Physical & registered | 04 Jan 2012 - 09 Dec 2015 |
Deloitte, 60 Grove Road, Christchurch, 8024 | Registered & physical | 18 Oct 2011 - 04 Jan 2012 |
291 Madras Street, Christchurch | Registered | 13 Apr 2000 - 18 Oct 2011 |
291 Madras Street, Christchurch | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 13 Apr 2000 |
291 Madras Street, Christchurch | Physical | 02 Jun 1999 - 18 Oct 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hurford, Catherine Individual |
Huntsbury Christchurch 8022 |
19 Dec 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hurford, John Individual |
Huntsbury Christchurch 8022 |
19 Dec 2007 - current |
Hatherly Loughnan Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031092333 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Shirley Christchurch 8061 |
09 Nov 2021 - current |
Hurford, Catherine Individual |
Huntsbury Christchurch 8022 |
19 Dec 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hurford, John Individual |
Huntsbury Christchurch 8022 |
19 Dec 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcnab, David Wayne Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 |
14 Nov 2016 - 03 Jun 2021 |
Leicester Trustee Services No 2 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033894454 Company Number: 1860924 Entity |
19 Dec 2007 - 14 Nov 2016 | |
Leicester Trustee Services No 2 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033894454 Company Number: 1860924 Entity |
19 Dec 2007 - 14 Nov 2016 | |
Hurford, Thomas Individual |
Blenheim |
02 Jun 1999 - 16 Jan 2006 |
Drazi Developments Limited 34 Birmingham Drive |
|
Aurora Technology Limited 34 Birmingham Drive |
|
Arundel Trustee Services Limited 34 Birmingham Drive |
|
Vulcan Place Investments Limited 36 Birmingham Drive |
|
Yorke Limited 36 Birmingham Drive |
|
Gb & Dw Transport Limited 36 Birmingham Drive |