Wallenius Wilhelmsen Ocean As (issued an NZ business number of 9429037551490) was launched on 21 Jun 1999. 1 address is currently in use by the company: Level 14, 152 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered. Level 14, 152 Quay Street, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 13 Jun 2018. Wallenius Wilhelmsen Ocean As used more aliases, namely: Wallenius Wilhelmsen Logistics As from 31 May 2007 to 15 Jun 2018, Wallenius Wilhelmsen Lines As (21 Jun 1999 to 31 May 2007). Our information was updated on 02 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 14, 152 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 13 Jun 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kristin Schjodt Bitnes
Nesoya, 1397
Address used since 02 Sep 2021 |
Director | 02 Sep 2021 - current |
Anne Jones
Baerums Verk, 1354
Address used since 23 Jun 2022 |
Director | 23 Jun 2022 - current |
Martin Hvatum
Oslo, 0772
Address used since 15 May 2023 |
Director | 15 May 2023 - current |
Richard Chu
152 Quay Street, Auckland, 1142
Address used since 31 Aug 2006 |
Person Authorised For Service | unknown - unknown |
Richard Chu
152 Quay Street, Auckland, 1142
Address used since 31 Aug 2006 |
Person Authorised for Service | unknown - current |
Anette Orsten
Oslo, 0350
Address used since 14 Dec 2020 |
Director | 14 Dec 2020 - 15 May 2023 |
Christen Pierre Schreuder
Jar, 1358
Address used since 14 Dec 2020 |
Director | 14 Dec 2020 - 23 Jun 2022 |
Anniken Furseth Berg
Jar, 1358
Address used since 17 Jun 2020 |
Director | 17 Jun 2020 - 01 Sep 2021 |
Craig Louis Jasienski
Oslo, 1170
Address used since 04 Apr 2017 |
Director | 04 Apr 2017 - 14 Dec 2020 |
Per Hermod Rasmussen
Gjettum, 1346
Address used since 17 Jun 2020 |
Director | 17 Jun 2020 - 19 Oct 2020 |
Malfrid Lundell
Fornebu, 1364
Address used since 26 Jun 2018 |
Director | 26 Jun 2018 - 17 Jun 2020 |
Jan Dahm Simonsen
Stabekk, 1369
Address used since 26 Jun 2018 |
Director | 26 Jun 2018 - 17 Jun 2020 |
Rebekka Glasser Herlofsen
Oslo, 0276
Address used since 04 Apr 2017 |
Director | 04 Apr 2017 - 06 May 2020 |
Michael Hubertus Hynekamp
Hovik, 1363
Address used since 04 Apr 2017 |
Director | 04 Apr 2017 - 26 Jun 2018 |
Ari Raymond Marjamaa
Oslo, 0375
Address used since 04 Apr 2017 |
Director | 04 Apr 2017 - 26 Jun 2018 |
Thomas Wilhelmsen
0786 Oslo,
Address used since 26 Mar 2007 |
Director | 26 Mar 2007 - 04 Apr 2017 |
Jonas K. | Director | 08 May 2010 - 04 Apr 2017 |
Diderik Borsting Schnitler
Tonsberg, 3124
Address used since 08 May 2010 |
Director | 08 May 2010 - 04 Apr 2017 |
Bengt O. | Director | 08 May 2010 - 04 Apr 2017 |
Jan B. | Director | 28 Jan 2011 - 04 Apr 2017 |
Jan Eyvin Wang
Bekkestua, 1357
Address used since 07 Feb 2011 |
Director | 07 Feb 2011 - 04 Apr 2017 |
Lars L. | Director | 01 Sep 2013 - 04 Apr 2017 |
Leif Terje Loddesol
Oslo, 0377
Address used since 12 Apr 2010 |
Director | 12 Apr 2010 - 01 Sep 2013 |
Wilhelm Wilhelmsen
N -380, Oslo,
Address used since 21 Jun 1999 |
Director | 21 Jun 1999 - 12 Apr 2010 |
Sjur Lars Galtung
N -0765, Oslo,
Address used since 21 Jun 1999 |
Director | 21 Jun 1999 - 12 Apr 2010 |
Bengt E. | Director | 03 Feb 2003 - 12 Apr 2010 |
Arild Ole Borgund Iversen
N-1388, Borgen,
Address used since 03 Feb 2003 |
Director | 03 Feb 2003 - 12 Apr 2010 |
Odd Ingar Skaug
N-1363 Hovik,
Address used since 07 Apr 2003 |
Director | 07 Apr 2003 - 12 Apr 2010 |
Lone S. | Director | 26 Jan 2006 - 12 Apr 2010 |
Goran O. | Director | 08 Jun 2006 - 12 Apr 2010 |
Anders T. | Director | 25 Oct 2007 - 12 Apr 2010 |
Jonas Olof Gillis Kleberg
S - 167 61, Bromma, Sweden,
Address used since 21 Jun 1999 |
Director | 21 Jun 1999 - 25 Oct 2007 |
Bengt Christer Olsson
S-182 62, Djursholm, Sweden,
Address used since 31 Aug 2006 |
Director | 21 Jun 1999 - 08 Dec 2006 |
Raymond Paul Ebeling
07430, United States Of America,
Address used since 09 Aug 2000 |
Director | 09 Aug 2000 - 01 Jan 2006 |
Leif T Loddesol
N - 0369, Oslo, Norway,
Address used since 21 Jun 1999 |
Director | 21 Jun 1999 - 04 Jul 2003 |
Nils Petter Dyvik
58b, N - 0382, Oslo, Norway,
Address used since 21 Jun 1999 |
Director | 21 Jun 1999 - 01 Nov 2002 |
Carl-john Wilhelm B:son Hagman
Se-182 63 Djursholm, Sweden,
Address used since 23 Mar 2001 |
Director | 23 Mar 2001 - 30 May 2002 |
Klas Gustav Gillis Kleberg
S - 114 53, Stockholm, Sweden,
Address used since 21 Jun 1999 |
Director | 21 Jun 1999 - 23 Mar 2001 |
Bengt Anders Hedenstrom
S - 114 56, Stockholm, Sweden,
Address used since 21 Jun 1999 |
Director | 21 Jun 1999 - 09 Aug 2000 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 14, 152 Quay Street, Auckland, 1142 | Registered | 28 Oct 2011 - 13 Jun 2018 |
Level 6, Ami House, 63 Albert Street, Auckland | Registered | 22 Aug 2006 - 22 Aug 2006 |
9th Floor, Price Waterhouse Centre, 66 Wyndham Street, Auckland | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 22 Aug 2006 |
Prazma Investment Trust Limited Level 11, Harbour View Building |
|
Cj Luxury Hotel Trust Limited Level 11, Harbour View Building |
|
Rac Transport Limited 152 Quay Street |
|
Morrison Corporate Trustee Limited Level 11, Harbour View Building |
|
Associates Trust Limited Level 11, Harbour View Building |
|
Couch & Co. Limited Level 11, Harbour View Building |