Mccollam Capital Partners Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429037433628) was incorporated on 07 Dec 1999. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Suite 2801 Sentinel Apartments, 3 Northcroft Street, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 (type: registered, physical). 49 Roland Road, Greenhithe, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 07 Dec 2020. 300000 shares are allocated to 7 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 100000 shares (33.33 per cent of shares), namely:
Varney, James Thomas (an individual) located at 5-7 Corinthian Drive, Albany, Auckland postcode 0632,
Jasper, Caren Lee (an individual) located at Hobsonville, Auckland postcode 0616,
Mccollam, Alfred Barry (an individual) located at Takapuna, Auckland postcode 0622. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33 per cent of all shares (exactly 100000 shares); it includes
Embar Holdings Limited (an entity) - located at Takapuna, Auckland. The next group of shareholders, share allocation (100000 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Mccollam, Steven Barry, located at Mairangi Bay, Auckland (an individual),
Mccollam, Alfred Barry, located at Takapuna, Auckland (an individual),
Varney, James Thomas, located at 5-7 Corinthian Drive, Albany, Auckland (an individual). Our database was updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Suite 2801 Sentinel Apartments, 3 Northcroft Street, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Registered & physical & service | 07 Dec 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alfred Barry Mccollam
Takapuna, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 17 Mar 2014 |
Director | 07 Dec 1999 - current |
Steven Barry Mccollam
Rd 1 Waharoa, Waikato, 3474
Address used since 21 Dec 2021
Arrowtown, Arrowtown, 9302
Address used since 01 Apr 2016 |
Director | 07 Dec 1999 - current |
Caren Lee Jasper
Hobsonville, Auckland, 0616
Address used since 11 Apr 2023
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 21 Dec 2021
Takapuna, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 05 Dec 2020
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 17 Mar 2014 |
Director | 07 Dec 1999 - current |
Jonathan Paul Stuart Hislop
Rd 6, Warkworth, 0986
Address used since 24 Jan 2011 |
Director | 07 Dec 1999 - 05 Jan 2011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
49 Roland Road, Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical | 17 Mar 2014 - 07 Dec 2020 |
C/o Hwi Ltd, Level 3, 139 Carlton Gore, Rd, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered & physical | 17 Dec 2004 - 17 Mar 2014 |
The Offices Of Hwi Limited, 100 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 17 Dec 2004 |
The Offices Of Hwi Limited, 100 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical | 07 Dec 1999 - 17 Dec 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Varney, James Thomas Individual |
5-7 Corinthian Drive Albany, Auckland 0632 |
23 Mar 2011 - current |
Jasper, Caren Lee Individual |
Hobsonville Auckland 0616 |
24 Nov 2008 - current |
Mccollam, Alfred Barry Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
17 Jun 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Embar Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032155891 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
07 Dec 1999 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mccollam, Steven Barry Individual |
Mairangi Bay Auckland 0630 |
01 Apr 2005 - current |
Mccollam, Alfred Barry Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
17 Jun 2008 - current |
Varney, James Thomas Individual |
5-7 Corinthian Drive Albany, Auckland 0632 |
23 Mar 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mccollam, Alfred Barry Individual |
Takapuna Auckland |
26 Mar 2007 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Mccollam, Steven Barry Individual |
R D 3 Cambridge, Hamilton |
07 Dec 1999 - 15 Sep 2004 |
Mccollam, Alfred Barry Individual |
Takapuna Auckland |
07 Dec 1999 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Mccollam, Alfred Barry Individual |
Takapuna Auckland |
07 Dec 1999 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Caren Lee, Jasper Individual |
Takapuna Auckland |
17 Jun 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Jasper, Caren Lee Individual |
Takapuna Auckland |
15 Sep 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Hislop, Jonathan Paul Stuart Individual |
Rd 6 Warkworth 0986 |
07 Dec 1999 - 23 Mar 2011 |
Jasper, Caren Lee Individual |
Takapuna Auckland |
07 Dec 1999 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Hislop, Jonathan Paul Stuart Individual |
Rd 6 Warkworth 0986 |
07 Dec 1999 - 23 Mar 2011 |
Mccollam, Alfred Barry Individual |
Takapuna Auckland |
15 Sep 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Mcort Holdings Limited 71 Roland Road |
|
Therm Limited 71 Roland Road |
|
Mr Pink Limited 73 Roland Road |
|
Lochinvar Limited 1 Waipuia Place |
|
Greyfox Services Limited 1 Waipuia Place |
|
Enchem Limited 56 Roland Road |