Celadon Orchard Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429037403133) was launched on 05 Jan 2000. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 13 Mclean Street, Tauranga, 3110 (type: physical, registered). 13 Mclean Street, Tauranga had been their physical address, up until 27 Aug 2020. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Harris Tate Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Tauranga postcode 3110,
Mulligan, Kathleen Mary (an individual) located at Bethlehem, Tauranga postcode 3110,
Mulligan, Peter Edward (an individual) located at Bethlehem, Tauranga postcode 3110. Our data was last updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
13 Mclean Street, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered & service | 27 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Edward Mulligan
Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 08 Sep 2022
Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 06 Sep 2010 |
Director | 05 Jan 2000 - current |
Andrew Taylor
Rd 2, Opotiki, 3198
Address used since 23 Sep 2015 |
Director | 03 Jun 2010 - 14 Feb 2023 |
Craig Murray Thompson
Opotiki,
Address used since 30 Sep 2003 |
Director | 05 Jan 2000 - 03 Jun 2010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
13 Mclean Street, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered | 14 Sep 2010 - 27 Aug 2020 |
44 Reads Quay, Gisborne | Registered & physical | 10 Jun 2010 - 14 Sep 2010 |
108 Lowe Street, Gisborne | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 10 Jun 2010 |
108 Lowe Street, Gisborne | Physical | 05 Jan 2000 - 10 Jun 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Harris Tate Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038230370 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga 3110 |
05 Jan 2000 - current |
Mulligan, Kathleen Mary Individual |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 |
05 Jan 2000 - current |
Mulligan, Peter Edward Individual |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 |
05 Jan 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tait Fleming Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037575212 Company Number: 961886 Entity |
Opotiki |
17 Mar 2021 - 26 Jan 2023 |
Taylor, Andrew Individual |
Rd 2 Opotiki 3198 |
09 Jun 2010 - 26 Jan 2023 |
Taylor, Andrew Individual |
Rd 2 Opotiki 3198 |
09 Jun 2010 - 26 Jan 2023 |
Taylor, Andrew Individual |
Rd 2 Opotiki 3198 |
09 Jun 2010 - 26 Jan 2023 |
Ohiwa Hort Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038417306 Company Number: 697049 Entity |
05 Jan 2000 - 16 Nov 2009 | |
Tait, Robert Bertram Individual |
Rd 5 Tauranga 3175 |
09 Jun 2010 - 17 Mar 2021 |
Ohiwa Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037326913 Company Number: 1022064 Entity |
16 Nov 2009 - 16 Nov 2009 | |
Ohiwa Hort Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038417306 Company Number: 697049 Entity |
05 Jan 2000 - 16 Nov 2009 | |
Ohiwa Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037326913 Company Number: 1022064 Entity |
16 Nov 2009 - 16 Nov 2009 |
Testament Investments Limited Suite 3, 13 Mclean Street |
|
In-out Limited 13 Mclean Street |
|
Stoke Rentals Limited 13 Mclean Street |
|
Developing Potential Limited 13 Mclean Street |
|
M.d. Rural Limited 13 Mclean Street |
|
Body Mechanics Personal Training Limited 13 Mclean Street |