Badcock Trucking Company Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429037366230) was launched on 21 Feb 2000. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 216 Broxton Road, Rd 1, Hawarden, 7385 (type: physical, service). 1430 Matiri Valley Road, Murchison had been their physical address, up until 11 Nov 2020. 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 990 shares (99% of shares), namely:
Badcock, Michael Joseph (an individual) located at Rd 1, Hawarden postcode 7385. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (10 shares); it includes
Badcock, Stella Renae (a director) - located at Rd 1, Hawarden. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 02 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
52 Grove Road, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 | Registered | 23 May 2017 |
216 Broxton Road, Rd 1, Hawarden, 7385 | Physical & service | 11 Nov 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael Joseph Badcock
Rd 1, Hawarden, 7385
Address used since 03 Nov 2020
Rd 3, Murchison, 7077
Address used since 18 Nov 2010 |
Director | 21 Feb 2000 - current |
Stella Renae Badcock
Rd 1, Hawarden, 7385
Address used since 03 Nov 2020
Rd 3, Murchison, 7077
Address used since 18 Feb 2013 |
Director | 18 Feb 2013 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1430 Matiri Valley Road, Murchison, 7077 | Physical | 23 May 2017 - 11 Nov 2020 |
102 Clyde Street, Balclutha, Balclutha, 9230 | Physical & registered | 26 Nov 2010 - 23 May 2017 |
Shand Thomson Ltd, Chartered Accountants, 102 Clyde Street, Balclutha | Registered & physical | 19 Nov 2009 - 26 Nov 2010 |
Whk West Yates, A Division Of Whk (nz) Ltd, 72 Trafalgar Street, Nelson | Registered & physical | 01 Dec 2008 - 19 Nov 2009 |
West Yates Chartered Accountants, 72 Trafalgar Street, Nelson | Physical & registered | 29 Nov 2007 - 01 Dec 2008 |
West Yates, 72 Trafalgar Street, Nelson | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 29 Nov 2007 |
West Yates, 72 Trafalgar Street, Nelson | Physical | 21 Feb 2000 - 29 Nov 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Badcock, Michael Joseph Individual |
Rd 1 Hawarden 7385 |
21 Feb 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Badcock, Stella Renae Director |
Rd 1 Hawarden 7385 |
12 Aug 2013 - current |
Sanson Farming Co Limited 102 Clyde Street |
|
Tim White Electrical Limited 102 Clyde Street |
|
Glensdale Limited 102 Clyde Street |
|
Clarke Agri Limited 102 Clyde Street |
|
Hewitt Dairy Enterprises Limited 102 Clyde Street |
|
Trk Farm Limited 102 Clyde Street |