Grenville Investments Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429037364984) was registered on 15 Feb 2000. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 82 Westmorland Rise, Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 (type: physical, registered). 82 Westmorland Rise, Bethlehem, Tauranga 3001 had been their physical address, up until 12 Apr 2012. Grenville Investments Limited used other aliases, namely: Grenville Developments Limited from 15 Feb 2000 to 02 Dec 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Calvert, Ian Grenville (an individual) located at Bethlehem, Tauranga postcode 3110. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Calvert, Victoria Jane (an individual) - located at Bethlehem, Tauranga. "Apartment renting or leasing - except holiday apartment" (ANZSIC L671110) is the classification the ABS issued to Grenville Investments Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
82 Westmorland Rise, Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered & service | 12 Apr 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ian Grenville Calvert
Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 02 Apr 2012 |
Director | 15 Feb 2000 - current |
Victoria Jane Calvert
Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 02 Apr 2012 |
Director | 15 Feb 2000 - current |
82 Westmorland Rise , Bethlehem , Tauranga , 3110 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
82 Westmorland Rise, Bethlehem, Tauranga 3001 | Physical & registered | 21 Apr 2006 - 12 Apr 2012 |
213 Waihi Road, Judea, Tauranga 3001 | Physical & registered | 01 May 2003 - 21 Apr 2006 |
11 Operiana Street, Ngongotaha, Rotorua | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 01 May 2003 |
11 Operiana Street, Ngongotaha, Rotorua | Physical | 15 Feb 2000 - 01 May 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Calvert, Ian Grenville Individual |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 |
15 Feb 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Calvert, Victoria Jane Individual |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 |
15 Feb 2000 - current |
Strategic Missions Charitable Trust Board 77 Westmorland Rise |
|
O2 Church Trust Board 1 Raukawa Drive |
|
Private Trust (management) Company Limited 18 Harbelle Close |
|
Kiwiviper Limited 6 Harken Close |
|
Ndal Laboratories Limited 6 Harken Close |
|
Daman Beckett Builders Limited 70 Westmorland Rise |
Sharpilly Holdings Limited 195 Devonport Road |
Quest Four Limited Level 2, 247 Cameron Road |
Whitestuff Company Limited 32 Karner Drive |
Reayou Investment Limited 21 Kerswell Terrace |
Mossman Industries Limited 19 Victoria Street |
Swiss Enterprises Limited 16 Fergusson Street |