Modus Group Nz Limited (issued a business number of 9429037361662) was incorporated on 23 Feb 2000. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 55 Eighth Avenue, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (type: physical, service). 556 Cameron Road, Tauranga had been their registered address, until 23 Jan 2014. Modus Group Nz Limited used other names, namely: Aquatech Shower Solutions Limited from 28 Mar 2012 to 16 Jun 2017, Drybase International Limited (13 Jul 2009 to 28 Mar 2012) and A C T Limited (03 Feb 2004 - 13 Jul 2009). 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Goodhue, Murray Gilbert (an individual) located at Otumoetai, Tauranga postcode 3110. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Goodhue, Philippa Ann (an individual) - located at Otumoetai, Tauranga. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
55 Eighth Avenue, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & service & registered | 23 Jan 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Murray Gilbert Goodhue
Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 01 May 2016 |
Director | 23 Feb 2000 - current |
Jason Paul Goodhue
Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 03 Apr 2012 |
Director | 03 Apr 2012 - 12 Feb 2016 |
Michael Robert Green
Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1080
Address used since 03 Apr 2012 |
Director | 03 Apr 2012 - 11 Feb 2016 |
Philippa Ann Goodhue
Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 23 Feb 2000 |
Director | 23 Feb 2000 - 03 Apr 2012 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
556 Cameron Road, Tauranga | Registered | 13 Apr 2000 - 23 Jan 2014 |
556 Cameron Road, Tauranga | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 13 Apr 2000 |
556 Cameron Road, Tauranga | Physical | 23 Feb 2000 - 23 Jan 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Goodhue, Murray Gilbert Individual |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 |
23 Feb 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Goodhue, Philippa Ann Individual |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 |
23 Feb 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Green, Michael Robert Individual |
Ostend Waiheke Island 1080 |
09 Aug 2012 - 01 Jun 2016 |
Mcfitz Holdings Limited 55 Eighth Avenue |
|
Woodlands Boutique Village Limited 55 Eighth Avenue |
|
Vosper Property Management Limited 55 Eighth Avenue |
|
Casper Corporation Limited 55 Eighth Avenue |
|
Mini Kitchens Australia Pty Limited 55 Eighth Avenue |
|
Gta Property Limited 55 Eighth Avenue |