Landco Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429037352899) was launched on 20 Mar 2000. 1 address is in use by the company: 38K Lunn Ave, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1072 (type: registered, physical). Flat 5, 38B Lunn Avenue, Mount Wellington, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 13 Mar 2019. Landco Limited used other aliases, namely: Landco Limited from 20 Mar 2000 to 06 Sep 2005. 41588460 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 21020419 shares (50.54 per cent of shares), namely:
The Pheonix Trust Limited (an entity) located at Mount Wellington, Auckland postcode 1072. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 49.46 per cent of all shares (exactly 20568041 shares); it includes
The Bankhouse Trust Limited (an entity) - located at Kohimarama, Auckland. Our information was updated on 25 Apr 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
38k Lunn Ave, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1072 | Registered & physical | 13 Mar 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Errol Wayne Bailey
Papanui, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 21 Oct 2021 |
Director | 21 Oct 2021 - current |
Gregory Martin Olliver
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 15 Jan 2021
Glendowie, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 23 Jul 2018
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Nov 2013 |
Director | 20 Mar 2000 - 21 Oct 2021 |
Anthony John Keenan
Belmont, Auckland,
Address used since 14 Sep 2005 |
Director | 14 Sep 2005 - 08 Aug 2008 |
Brett Christopher Sutton
Thorndon, Wellington,
Address used since 28 Jan 2008 |
Director | 14 Sep 2005 - 17 Jul 2008 |
Robert William Bryden
Upper Hutt,
Address used since 14 Sep 2005 |
Director | 14 Sep 2005 - 17 Jul 2008 |
Wayne Robert Boyd
Whangaparaoa, Auckland,
Address used since 14 Sep 2005 |
Director | 14 Sep 2005 - 16 Apr 2008 |
Jonathan Peter Hartley
Karori, Wellington,
Address used since 14 Sep 2005 |
Director | 14 Sep 2005 - 16 Apr 2008 |
Peter John Haworth
St Heliers, Auckland,
Address used since 23 Apr 2004 |
Director | 23 Apr 2004 - 15 Jul 2005 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Flat 5, 38b Lunn Avenue, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1072 | Physical & registered | 31 Jul 2018 - 13 Mar 2019 |
237c Tamaki Drive, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 | Physical | 13 Mar 2017 - 31 Jul 2018 |
237c Tamaki Drive, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 | Registered | 16 Dec 2015 - 31 Jul 2018 |
26 St Heliers Bay Road, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 | Registered | 24 Sep 2008 - 16 Dec 2015 |
26 St Heliers Bay Road, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 | Physical | 24 Sep 2008 - 13 Mar 2017 |
Level 28, Pricewaterhousecoopers Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 21 Oct 2004 - 24 Sep 2008 |
Landco Limited, Level 28, 188 Quay Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 16 Apr 2003 - 21 Oct 2004 |
3rd Floor, Landsborough House, Cnr, Durham And Gloucester Streets, Christchurch | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 16 Apr 2003 |
3rd Floor, Landsborough House, Cnr, Durham And Gloucester Streets, Christchurch | Registered | 01 Apr 2000 - 12 Apr 2000 |
3rd Floor, Landsborough House, Cnr, Durham And Gloucester Streets, Christchurch | Physical | 20 Mar 2000 - 16 Apr 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Pheonix Trust Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037819354 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1072 |
20 Mar 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Bankhouse Trust Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036969852 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 |
18 Jul 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Pheonix Trust Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037819354 Company Number: 913749 Entity |
Mount Wellington Auckland 1072 |
01 Sep 2006 - 28 Oct 2020 |
Todd Lc Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034718957 Company Number: 1644240 Entity |
05 Nov 2007 - 05 Nov 2007 | |
Todd Lc Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034718957 Company Number: 1644240 Entity |
05 Nov 2007 - 05 Nov 2007 | |
Todd Lc Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034718957 Company Number: 1644240 Entity |
29 Mar 2006 - 05 Nov 2007 | |
Todd Lc Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034718957 Company Number: 1644240 Entity |
01 Sep 2006 - 05 Nov 2007 | |
Todd Lc Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034718957 Company Number: 1644240 Entity |
01 Sep 2006 - 05 Nov 2007 | |
Todd Lc Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034718957 Company Number: 1644240 Entity |
29 Mar 2006 - 05 Nov 2007 |
Riddell Trust Limited 237c Tamaki Drive |
|
Green Fever Limited 237c Tamaki Road |
|
Tamaki Drive Limited 237 Tamaki Drive |
|
J L Shelf Co Limited 237c Tamaki Drive |
|
Lornie & Co Accountants Limited 237c Tamaki Drive |
|
Gerontious Enterprises Limited 237c Tamaki Drive |