Firewood Supplies Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429037324759) was registered on 17 Mar 2000. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 154 Gladstone Road North, Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024 (type: registered, physical). 37 Forfar Street, Mosgiel, Mosgiel had been their physical address, until 17 Jun 2020. 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 998 shares (99.8% of shares), namely:
Pg and Am Chalmers Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Mosgiel, Mosgiel postcode 9024. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.2% of all shares (exactly 2 shares); it includes
Chalmers, Peter Gerard (an individual) - located at Mosgiel, Mosgiel. Our information was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
154 Gladstone Road North, Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024 | Registered & physical & service | 17 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Gerard Chalmers
Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024
Address used since 08 Jun 2020
Mosgiel, 9024
Address used since 02 Mar 2015 |
Director | 17 Mar 2000 - current |
Anne Mary Chalmers
Mosgiel, 9024
Address used since 02 Feb 2010 |
Director | 17 Mar 2000 - 18 Jul 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
37 Forfar Street, Mosgiel, Mosgiel, 9024 | Physical & registered | 14 Apr 2020 - 17 Jun 2020 |
54 Cass Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Physical & registered | 20 Mar 2017 - 14 Apr 2020 |
100 Burnett Street, Ashburton | Registered | 13 Apr 2000 - 20 Mar 2017 |
100 Burnett Street, Ashburton | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 13 Apr 2000 |
100 Burnett Street, Ashburton | Physical | 17 Mar 2000 - 20 Mar 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pg And Am Chalmers Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050295708 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 |
12 Apr 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chalmers, Peter Gerard Individual |
Mosgiel Mosgiel 9024 |
17 Mar 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Parr, Eric Thomas Individual |
Allenton Ashburton 7700 |
08 Feb 2005 - 12 Apr 2022 |
Chalmers, Anne Mary Individual |
Mosgiel |
17 Mar 2000 - 02 Mar 2015 |
Ashburton Guardian Company Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
Kiwicorp Products Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
Chris Woods Contracting Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
A & J Lowe Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
Rudge Holdings Limited 54 Cass Street |
|
V P Farming Limited 54 Cass Street |