Keystone Dairies Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429036970155) was registered on 22 Mar 2001. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 160 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 (type: registered, physical). C/- Mcintyre Dick & Partners, 160 Spey Street, Invercargill had been their physical address, up to 14 Aug 2012. Keystone Dairies Limited used other aliases, namely: Eire Farm Limited from 22 Mar 2001 to 21 Apr 2017. 1200 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.08% of shares), namely:
Erskine, Nathan Robert (an individual) located at Rd 3, Gore postcode 9773. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.08% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Erskine, Deborah Lee (an individual) - located at Rd 3, Gore. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (1198 shares, 99.83%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Erskine, Nathan Robert, located at 564 East Chatton Road, Rd 3, Gore (an individual),
Erskine, Deborah Lee, located at 564 East Chatton Road, Rd 3, Gore (an individual). Businesscheck's data was updated on 31 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
160 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Aug 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nathan Robert Erskine
R D 3, Gore, 9773
Address used since 20 Aug 2015
Rd 3, Gore, 9773
Address used since 25 Aug 2017 |
Director | 22 Mar 2001 - current |
Deborah Lee Erskine
R D 3, Gore, 9773
Address used since 20 Aug 2015 |
Director | 14 Jan 2010 - 21 Apr 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/- Mcintyre Dick & Partners, 160 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 | Physical & registered | 15 Aug 2011 - 14 Aug 2012 |
C/- Mcintyre Dick & Partners, 160 Spey Street, Invercargill | Physical & registered | 19 Aug 2002 - 15 Aug 2011 |
C/- Fms Chartered Accountants, 142 Spey Street, Invercargill | Registered & physical | 22 Mar 2001 - 19 Aug 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Erskine, Nathan Robert Individual |
Rd 3 Gore 9773 |
22 Mar 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Erskine, Deborah Lee Individual |
Rd 3 Gore 9773 |
22 Mar 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Erskine, Nathan Robert Individual |
564 East Chatton Road, Rd 3 Gore 9773 |
01 Jun 2017 - current |
Erskine, Deborah Lee Individual |
564 East Chatton Road, Rd 3 Gore 9773 |
01 Jun 2017 - current |
Jimmys Pies Limited 160 Spey Street |
|
Altitude Resurfacing Limited 160 Spey Street |
|
The Reinforcer Limited 160 Spey Street |
|
Ultra-scan Southern Southland Limited 160 Spey Street |
|
Mollison & Associates Limited 160 Spey Street |
|
Mbss Limited 160 Spey Street |