Woodnook Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429036917891) was incorporated on 02 May 2001. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 58 Otaika Road, Woodhill, Whangarei, 0110 (type: physical, registered). 32 Rathbone Street, Whangarei, Whangarei had been their physical address, until 30 Nov 2017. Woodnook Limited used more aliases, namely: Woodnook Properties Limited from 03 May 2007 to 30 Sep 2014, M J Cutforth Limited (02 May 2001 to 03 May 2007). 100 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 98 shares (98 per cent of shares), namely:
Cutforth, Murray James (an individual) located at Whakapara, Hikurangi postcode 0182,
Cutforth, Jodeen Lee (an individual) located at Whakapara, Hikurangi postcode 0182,
Russell Turner Cutforth Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Whangarei, Whangarei postcode 0110. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Cutforth, Jodeen Lee (an individual) - located at Whakapara, Hikurangi. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Cutforth, Murray James, located at Whakapara, Hikurangi (an individual). Our database was last updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
58 Otaika Road, Woodhill, Whangarei, 0110 | Physical & registered & service | 30 Nov 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Murray James Cutforth
Whakapara, Hikurangi, 0182
Address used since 11 May 2016 |
Director | 02 May 2001 - current |
Jodeen Lee Cutforth
Whakapara, Hikurangi, 0182
Address used since 11 May 2016 |
Director | 25 Aug 2008 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
32 Rathbone Street, Whangarei, Whangarei, 0110 | Physical & registered | 19 May 2016 - 30 Nov 2017 |
4th Floor, 30-34, Rathbone Str, Whangarei | Physical & registered | 02 May 2001 - 19 May 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cutforth, Murray James Individual |
Whakapara Hikurangi 0182 |
18 Aug 2009 - current |
Cutforth, Jodeen Lee Individual |
Whakapara Hikurangi 0182 |
18 Aug 2009 - current |
Russell Turner Cutforth Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046426277 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whangarei Whangarei 0110 |
22 Nov 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cutforth, Jodeen Lee Individual |
Whakapara Hikurangi 0182 |
11 Sep 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cutforth, Murray James Individual |
Whakapara Hikurangi 0182 |
02 May 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gb Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036872282 Company Number: 1143715 Entity |
Whangarei Whangarei 0110 |
18 Aug 2009 - 22 Nov 2017 |
Gb Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036872282 Company Number: 1143715 Entity |
18 Aug 2009 - 22 Nov 2017 |
Fieldco Limited 58 Otaika Road |
|
Sri Menanti Gunyah Limited 58 Otaika Road |
|
Windcrest Limited 58 Otaika Road |
|
Mane Transport Limited 58 Otaika Road |
|
Sanctuary Palms Trustee Limited 58 Otaika Road |
|
Alice's Clothing Alterations Limited 58 Otaika Road |