Advosure Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429036911493) was launched on 11 May 2001. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 2 Cassidy Drive, Orewa, Auckland, 0931 (type: postal, office). 9A Bundoran Way, Pinehill, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 01 Sep 2020. Advosure Limited used more aliases, namely: Biggerfish.co.nz Limited from 11 May 2001 to 14 Apr 2022. 1000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Mcgowan, Steve David Alan (an individual) located at Orewa, Auckland postcode 0931. "Insurance consultant service" (ANZSIC K642050) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Advosure Limited. Our information was last updated on 24 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2 Cassidy Drive, Orewa, Auckland, 0931 | Registered & physical & service | 01 Sep 2020 |
2 Cassidy Drive, Orewa, Auckland, 0931 | Office & delivery | 06 Nov 2020 |
2 Cassidy Drive, Orewa, Auckland, 0931 | Postal | 01 Nov 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Steve David Alan Mcgowan
Orewa, Orewa, 0931
Address used since 24 Aug 2020
Pinehill, North Shore City, 0632
Address used since 21 Jan 2010 |
Director | 11 May 2001 - current |
Evan Kenneth Floyd
Northcote, Auckland,
Address used since 11 May 2001 |
Director | 11 May 2001 - 15 Jun 2001 |
Unit 2, 43 Apollo Drive , Mairangi Bay , North Shore City , 0632 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
9a Bundoran Way, Pinehill, Auckland, 0632 | Registered | 11 Dec 2019 - 01 Sep 2020 |
9a Bundoran Way, Pinehill, Auckland, 0632 | Physical | 31 Oct 2012 - 01 Sep 2020 |
Unit 2 43 Apollo Drive, Mairangi Bay, North Shore City, 0632 | Registered | 18 Oct 2010 - 11 Dec 2019 |
Unit 2 43 Apollo Drive, Mairangi Bay, North Shore City, 0632 | Physical | 18 Oct 2010 - 31 Oct 2012 |
1b Antares Place, Mairangi Bay, North Shore City | Physical & registered | 12 Dec 2008 - 18 Oct 2010 |
Level 6, 52 Swanson Street, Auckland City | Physical & registered | 07 Nov 2006 - 12 Dec 2008 |
9a Bundoran Way, Pinehill, Albany, Auckland | Physical & registered | 11 May 2001 - 07 Nov 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgowan, Steve David Alan Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
11 May 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgowan, Joanne Lisa Individual |
Orewa Auckland 0931 |
11 May 2001 - 21 Apr 2023 |
Fotc NZ Limited Partnership C/o Pieter Holl & Associates Ltd |
|
Buxton Gore Bay No.5 Limited Level 3, 14 Viaduct Harbour Ave |
|
Buxton Gore Bay No.1 Limited Level 3, 14 Viaduct Harbour Ave |
|
Wilson Consumer Products Limited Hobson Tower West |
|
Kls Holdings Limited Hobson Towers West |
Hatton Financial Services Limited Level 4, 21 Queen Street |
Insurance Lab Limited 300 Richmond Road |
Tmr Limited 4 Sefton Avenue |
Armstrong Insurance Advisers Limited 49 Ngataringa Road |
E-datainsurance NZ Limited 25 Great South Road |
Sandpiper Creations Limited 10 Kimberley Road |