Consul Group Holdings Limited (issued a business number of 9429036837526) was launched on 26 Jul 2001. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 15, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, registered). Level 17, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 22 Jun 2018. Consul Group Holdings Limited used other aliases, namely: Stace Hammond Holdings Limited from 26 Jul 2001 to 19 Dec 2001. 7 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1 share (14.29% of shares), namely:
Consul Holdings Limited (an entity) located at 85 Alexandra Street, Hamilton postcode 3204. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 28.57% of all shares (2 shares); it includes
Consul Holdings Limited (an entity) - located at 85 Alexandra Street, Hamilton. Our data was last updated on 17 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 15, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered & service | 22 Jun 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Giles Herbert John Brant
Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 03 Aug 2015 |
Director | 26 Jul 2001 - current |
Patrick William Frank Wilson
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 14 Jan 2021
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 03 Aug 2015 |
Director | 26 Jul 2001 - current |
Richard Paul Connolly
Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 03 Aug 2015 |
Director | 01 Dec 2001 - current |
Kalev James Crossland
Otonga Valley Road, Rd 1, Raglan,
Address used since 01 Dec 2001 |
Director | 01 Dec 2001 - 02 Jul 2013 |
Murray David Grant
Hamilton,
Address used since 03 Jul 2009 |
Director | 26 Jul 2001 - 08 Oct 2009 |
Warren John Hoare
Hamilton,
Address used since 26 Jul 2001 |
Director | 26 Jul 2001 - 21 May 2004 |
Andrew Alexander Holliday
Cheltenham, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Dec 2001 |
Director | 01 Dec 2001 - 21 Feb 2003 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 17, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 01 Nov 2009 - 22 Jun 2018 |
C/- Stace Hammond, Level 7, 45 Queen Street, Auckland | Registered | 18 Dec 2002 - 01 Nov 2009 |
C/- Stace Hammond, Level 7, 45 Queen Street, Auckland | Physical | 31 Jul 2001 - 31 Jul 2001 |
C/- Stace Hammond, Solicitors, 3 Caro Street, Hamilton | Registered | 26 Jul 2001 - 18 Dec 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Consul Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034215401 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
85 Alexandra Street Hamilton 3204 |
06 Aug 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Consul Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034215401 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
85 Alexandra Street Hamilton 3204 |
06 Aug 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Connolly, Richard Paul Individual |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 |
26 Jul 2001 - 06 Aug 2019 |
Wilson, Patrick William Frank Individual |
Metropolis 1 Courthouse Lane, Auckland |
26 Jul 2001 - 06 Aug 2019 |
Brick, Michael John Individual |
Christchurch |
26 Jul 2001 - 06 Aug 2019 |
Grant, Murray David Individual |
Hamilton |
26 Jul 2001 - 06 Aug 2019 |
Brant, Giles Herbert John Individual |
Hamilton |
26 Jul 2001 - 06 Aug 2019 |
Crossland, Kalev James Individual |
Otonga Valley Road R D 1, Raglan |
26 Jul 2001 - 08 Jul 2013 |
Hoare, Warren John Individual |
Hamilton |
26 Jul 2001 - 06 Jul 2004 |
Wilson, Patrick William Frank Individual |
Metropolis 1 Courthouse Lane, Auckland |
26 Jul 2001 - 06 Aug 2019 |
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited Level 6, 59 High Street |
|
Maui Finance Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited Level 14, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
|
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited Level 15, 126 Vincent Street |