Rv & Lh Kokich Farms Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429036816392) was launched on 13 Aug 2001. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 24 Austin Road, Maunu, Whangarei, 0110 (type: registered, physical). 747 Kokopu Road, Rd 9, Whangarei had been their registered address, until 31 Aug 2021. 1000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 3 entities and holds 998 shares (99.8% of shares), namely:
Kokich, Lorraine Heather (an individual) located at Maunu, Whangarei postcode 0110,
Yhpj Trustees (2012) Limited (an entity) located at Whangarei, Whangarei postcode 0110,
Kokich, Royce Vivian (an individual) located at Maunu, Whangarei postcode 0110. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Kokich, Lorraine Heather (an individual) - located at Maunu, Whangarei. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Kokich, Royce Vivian, located at Maunu, Whangarei (an individual). Businesscheck's database was last updated on 20 Nov 2023.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
24 Austin Road, Maunu, Whangarei, 0110 | Registered & physical & service | 31 Aug 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Royce Vivian Kokich
Maunu, Whangarei, 0110
Address used since 23 Aug 2021
Rd 9, Whangarei, 0179
Address used since 02 Mar 2016 |
Director | 13 Aug 2001 - current |
Lorraine Heather Kokich
Maunu, Whangarei, 0110
Address used since 23 Aug 2021
Rd 9, Whangarei, 0179
Address used since 02 Mar 2016 |
Director | 13 Aug 2001 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
747 Kokopu Road, Rd 9, Whangarei, 0179 | Registered & physical | 10 Mar 2016 - 31 Aug 2021 |
Kokopu, Rd 9, Whangarei | Physical & registered | 13 Aug 2001 - 10 Mar 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kokich, Lorraine Heather Individual |
Maunu Whangarei 0110 |
13 Aug 2001 - current |
Yhpj Trustees (2012) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030768253 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whangarei Whangarei 0110 |
02 Nov 2017 - current |
Kokich, Royce Vivian Individual |
Maunu Whangarei 0110 |
13 Aug 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kokich, Lorraine Heather Individual |
Maunu Whangarei 0110 |
13 Aug 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kokich, Royce Vivian Individual |
Maunu Whangarei 0110 |
13 Aug 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Yovich, Walter Mick George Individual |
Kensington Whangarei 0112 |
13 Aug 2001 - 02 Nov 2017 |
Paul Karels Building Limited Kokopu Road |
|
Danneb Limited 929 Kokopu Road |
|
Dill-russells Limited 505 Kokopu Road |
|
Davis Electrical & Solar Limited 343 Mcbeth Road |
|
Marsden Transport Solutions Limited 250 Stratton Road |
|
Alex Squires Limited 68 Crossett Road |