Rykas Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429036815302) was registered on 06 Aug 2001. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 8 Telford Ave, Balmoral, Auckland (type: registered, physical). 45 Masterton Rd, Rothesay Bay, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 29 Oct 2009. Rykas Limited used other names, namely: Brady and Short Limited from 06 Aug 2001 to 03 Nov 2008. 1000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 499 shares (49.9 per cent of shares), namely:
Short, Colleen (an individual) located at Titirangi, Waitakere postcode 0604. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Ford, Stephen Murray (an individual) - located at Titirangi, Auckland. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (500 shares, 50%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Short, Colin John, located at Titirangi, Waitakere (an individual). The Businesscheck database was updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
8 Telford Ave, Balmoral, Auckland | Registered & physical & service | 29 Oct 2009 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Colin John Short
Titirangi, Auckland, 0604
Address used since 03 Nov 2008 |
Director | 06 Aug 2001 - current |
Shaun Mark Brady
Rothesay Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 23 Apr 2003 |
Director | 06 Aug 2001 - 08 Oct 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
45 Masterton Rd, Rothesay Bay, Auckland | Registered & physical | 06 Aug 2001 - 29 Oct 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Short, Colleen Individual |
Titirangi Waitakere 0604 |
06 Aug 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ford, Stephen Murray Individual |
Titirangi Auckland |
06 Aug 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Short, Colin John Individual |
Titirangi Waitakere 0604 |
06 Aug 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brady, Peter Denne Individual |
Rothesay Bay Auckland |
06 Aug 2001 - 21 Oct 2008 |
Brady, Shaun Mark Individual |
Rothesay Bay Auckland |
06 Aug 2001 - 21 Oct 2008 |
Brady, Alison Individual |
Rothesay Bay Auckland |
06 Aug 2001 - 21 Oct 2008 |
Bassano Chiropractic & Imaging Limited 8 Telford Ave |
|
Mortgage Scene Limited 8 Telford Ave |
|
Container Traders Limited 8 Telford Ave |
|
Craigland Properties Limited 8 Telford Ave |
|
C & D Lockie Limited 8 Telford Avenue |
|
Commart Limited 8 Telford Ave |