Picton Village Bakery Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429036805433) was started on 15 Aug 2001. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 50 Pipitea Drive, Rd 3, Blenheim, 7273 (type: service, registered). 58 Arthur Street, Blenheim had been their registered address, up until 11 Mar 2022. 150 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 75 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Van Beek, Peter Johannes (an individual) located at Rd 3, Blenheim postcode 7273. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (75 shares); it includes
Van Beek, Rachel Stephanie (an individual) - located at Rd 3, Blenheim. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 03 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
52 Grove Road, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 | Physical & registered & service | 11 Mar 2022 |
50 Pipitea Drive, Rd 3, Blenheim, 7273 | Service | 15 Mar 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Johannes Van Beek
Rd 3, Blenheim, 7273
Address used since 30 Mar 2017 |
Director | 15 Aug 2001 - current |
Anne Margaret Perret
Stoke, Nelson,
Address used since 08 Sep 2006 |
Director | 25 Aug 2004 - 01 Dec 2008 |
Anne Margaret Mcmillan
New Brighton, Christchurch,
Address used since 09 Oct 2002 |
Director | 15 Aug 2001 - 26 Aug 2004 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
58 Arthur Street, Blenheim, 7201 | Registered & physical | 24 Jan 2022 - 11 Mar 2022 |
50 Pipitea Drive, Rd 3, Blenheim, 7273 | Physical | 12 Mar 2020 - 24 Jan 2022 |
52 Grove Road, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 | Registered | 12 Mar 2020 - 24 Jan 2022 |
65 Seymour Street, Blenheim, 7201 | Registered & physical | 18 Jan 2017 - 12 Mar 2020 |
65 Seymour Street, Blenheim, 7201 | Registered & physical | 05 Jan 2017 - 18 Jan 2017 |
59 High Street, Blenheim, 7201 | Physical & registered | 15 Aug 2001 - 05 Jan 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Van Beek, Peter Johannes Individual |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 |
15 Aug 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Van Beek, Rachel Stephanie Individual |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 |
15 Aug 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Perret, Anne Margaret Individual |
Stoke Nelson |
15 Aug 2001 - 08 Sep 2006 |
Port Underwood Contracting Services Limited 65 Seymour Street |
|
Pjs Investments 2013 Limited 65 Seymour Street |
|
Hall Family Farms Limited 65 Seymour Street |
|
Berakah Vineyard Management Limited 65 Seymour Street |
|
Lower Waihopai Dam Limited 65 Seymour Street |
|
Rossmore Limited 65 Seymour Street |