Techtorium New Zealand Institute Of Information Technology Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429036803514) was started on 20 Aug 2001. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 113-082, Newmarket, Auckland, 1149 (type: postal, office). Level 3, 5 Short St, Newmarket, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 09 Nov 2010. Techtorium New Zealand Institute Of Information Technology Limited used more aliases, namely: New Zealand Institute Of Information Technology Limited from 20 Aug 2001 to 24 Oct 2003. 100000 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 41250 shares (41.25 per cent of shares), namely:
Dowling, Patrick Jonathan (a director) located at Sandringham, Auckland postcode 1041. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 41.25 per cent of all shares (exactly 41250 shares); it includes
Hutchinson, Jan-Maree (a director) - located at Sandringham, Auckland. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allocation (10000 shares, 10%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Cb Trustees 2011 Limited, located at Newmarket, Auckland (an entity). "Workplace training" (ANZSIC P810170) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Techtorium New Zealand Institute Of Information Technology Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 182 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered & service | 09 Nov 2010 |
Po Box 113-082, Newmarket, Auckland, 1149 | Postal | 07 Oct 2020 |
Level 3, 182 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Office & delivery | 07 Oct 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Patrick Jonathan Dowling
Sandringham, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 29 Oct 2007 |
Director | 20 Aug 2001 - current |
Patrick Jonathan Broughill-dowling
Sandringham, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 29 Oct 2007 |
Director | 20 Aug 2001 - current |
Jan-maree Hutchinson
Sandringham, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 01 May 2014 |
Director | 01 May 2014 - current |
Rohan Sood
Ranui, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 02 Aug 2016 |
Director | 02 Aug 2016 - 31 Dec 2019 |
Adrienne Broughill-dowling
St Johns Park, Auckland,
Address used since 27 Oct 2005 |
Director | 27 Oct 2005 - 01 Mar 2006 |
Edward Kang
Auckland,
Address used since 20 Aug 2001 |
Director | 20 Aug 2001 - 15 Jul 2003 |
Level 3, 182 Broadway , Newmarket , Auckland , 1023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 5 Short St, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical & registered | 22 Nov 2004 - 09 Nov 2010 |
1 / 184 Norman Lesser Drive, St Johns Park, Auckland | Physical & registered | 24 Jul 2003 - 22 Nov 2004 |
Level 9, Bnz Tower, 125 Queen St, Auckland | Registered & physical | 20 Aug 2001 - 24 Jul 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dowling, Patrick Jonathan Director |
Sandringham Auckland 1041 |
07 Oct 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hutchinson, Jan-maree Director |
Sandringham Auckland 1041 |
30 May 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cb Trustees 2011 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031708609 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Newmarket Auckland |
12 May 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Martin, Matthew Individual |
Remuera Auckland |
15 Nov 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lazarus, Ivor Individual |
St Johns Auckland |
15 Nov 2004 - 15 Nov 2004 |
Spratt, Craig Individual |
5 Short Street Newmarket |
15 Nov 2004 - 15 Nov 2004 |
Woon, Albert Individual |
Dannemora Howick |
15 Nov 2004 - 15 Nov 2004 |
Newmarket Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037884192 Company Number: 900433 Entity |
28 Nov 2006 - 12 May 2016 | |
Lazarus Trust Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036838318 Company Number: 1150115 Entity |
28 Nov 2006 - 29 Oct 2007 | |
Kang, Edward Individual |
Auckland |
20 Aug 2001 - 15 Nov 2004 |
Kruger, Steven Individual |
Mairangi Bay Auckland |
28 Nov 2006 - 29 Oct 2007 |
Sood, Rohan Individual |
Ranui Auckland 0612 |
30 May 2016 - 07 Oct 2020 |
Broughill-dowling, Patrick Jonathan Individual |
Sandringham Auckland |
20 Aug 2001 - 07 Oct 2020 |
Lazarus Trust Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036838318 Company Number: 1150115 Entity |
28 Nov 2006 - 29 Oct 2007 | |
Newmarket Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037884192 Company Number: 900433 Entity |
28 Nov 2006 - 12 May 2016 | |
Poznanovich, Maxim Individual |
Ellerslie Auckland |
15 Nov 2004 - 14 Jun 2012 |
Business In The Community (2013) Limited Level 3, 255 Broadway |
|
Penrose Panel And Roofing Limited Level 2, 161 Manukau Road |
|
Exodus Trustees Limited Level 1, 10 Manukau Road |
|
Marianas Capital Limited Level 2, 142 Broadway, Newmarket |
|
Growingfund Investment Limited Level 1, 169 Manukau Road |
|
K J M Holdings Limited Level 1, 145 Manukau Road |
Techtorium Computer Training Limited Level 3, 182 Broadway |
Techtorium Limited Level 3, 182 Broadway |
Etraining 2012 Limited 31 Watling Street |
Negotiation Skills Limited 16 Shipherds Avenue |
Tailored Training Limited 12 Kensington Avenue |
Auckland Basics Limited Level 2, 142 Broadway |