Knobloch Property Investment Trust Limited (issued a business number of 9429036794447) was registered on 24 Aug 2001. 3 addresses are in use by the company: 34 Cavendish Drive, Manukau, Auckland, 2104 (type: office, registered). 34 Cavendish Drive, Manukau, Auckland had been their registered address, until 02 Jul 2021. Knobloch Property Investment Trust Limited used other aliases, namely: Y Not Rentals Limited from 24 Aug 2001 to 30 Aug 2004. 1000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 4 entities and holds 492 shares (49.2% of shares), namely:
Knobloch, Victoria Frances (an individual) located at Sunnyhills, Auckland postcode 2010,
Knobloch, Andrew Marshall (an individual) located at Howick, Auckland postcode 2014,
Knobloch, Christine Mary (an individual) located at Bucklands Beach, Auckland postcode 2012. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50.8% of all shares (exactly 508 shares); it includes
Knobloch, Ian Francis (an individual) - located at Bucklands Beach. The Businesscheck data was updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
34 Cavendish Drive, Manukau, Auckland, 2104 | Office | unknown |
15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & physical & service | 02 Jul 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ian Francis Knobloch
Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 03 Jul 2003 |
Director | 03 Jul 2003 - current |
Christine Mary Knobloch
Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 03 Jul 2003 |
Director | 03 Jul 2003 - current |
Nicola Tracy Mccamish
Wattle Downs, Manurewa,
Address used since 24 Aug 2001 |
Director | 24 Aug 2001 - 03 Jul 2003 |
Tony Robert Mccamish
Wattle Downs, Manurewa,
Address used since 24 Aug 2001 |
Director | 24 Aug 2001 - 03 Jul 2003 |
34 Cavendish Drive , Manukau , Auckland , 2104 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
34 Cavendish Drive, Manukau, Auckland, 2104 | Registered & physical | 07 Jul 2011 - 02 Jul 2021 |
53 Cavendish Drive, Manukau City | Physical & registered | 24 Aug 2001 - 07 Jul 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Knobloch, Victoria Frances Individual |
Sunnyhills Auckland 2010 |
05 Aug 2024 - current |
Knobloch, Andrew Marshall Individual |
Howick Auckland 2014 |
23 Jun 2022 - current |
Knobloch, Christine Mary Individual |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 |
24 Aug 2001 - current |
Knobloch, Ian Francis Individual |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 |
24 Aug 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Knobloch, Ian Francis Individual |
Bucklands Beach |
01 Feb 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Knobloch, Victoria Frances Individual |
Sunnyhills Auckland 2010 |
01 Dec 2020 - 01 Dec 2020 |
Knobloch, Andrew Marshall Individual |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 |
29 Jun 2011 - 01 Dec 2020 |
Help Office 2011 No.3 Limited 34 Cavendish Drive |
|
Magic Four Limited 34 Cavendish Drive |
|
Nocmap Limited 34 Cavendish Drive |
|
Eastern Expressions Limited 34 Cavendish Drive |
|
Miro Investments Limited 34 Cavendish Drive |
|
Palace Real Estate Limited 34 Cavendish Drive |