Ian Woods Mortgages Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429036787678) was started on 28 Aug 2001. 6 addresess are in use by the company: 45 Lincoln Street, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021 (type: postal, office). 142 Golf Rd, New Lynn, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 16 Apr 2015. 1000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Woods, Ian (an individual) located at Ponsonby, Auckland postcode 1021. "Mortgage broking service" (ANZSIC K641930) is the category the ABS issued Ian Woods Mortgages Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
45 Lincoln Street, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021 | Records & other (Address for Records) | 08 Apr 2015 |
45 Lincoln Street, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021 | Physical & registered & service | 16 Apr 2015 |
45 Lincoln Street, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021 | Postal & office | 03 May 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ian Woods
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 02 May 2016 |
Director | 28 Aug 2001 - current |
Ian Craig Woods
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 02 May 2016 |
Director | 28 Aug 2001 - current |
45 Lincoln Street , Ponsonby , Auckland , 1021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
142 Golf Rd, New Lynn, Auckland | Registered & physical | 22 Apr 2009 - 16 Apr 2015 |
Grant Thornton Auckland Limited, 152 Fanshawe Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 23 Oct 2007 - 22 Apr 2009 |
Grant Thornton Auckland Ltd, 97-101 Hobson St, Auckland | Physical | 20 Apr 2006 - 23 Oct 2007 |
Grant Thornton Ak Ltd, 97-101 Hobson St, Auckland | Registered | 20 Apr 2006 - 23 Oct 2007 |
C/- Withers Tsang & Co Limited, 24-26 Pollen Street, Ponsonby, Auckland | Registered | 20 Feb 2003 - 20 Apr 2006 |
C/- Withers Tsang & Co, 24-26 Pollen Street, Ponsonby, Auckland | Physical | 20 Feb 2003 - 20 Apr 2006 |
Gosling Chapman, Chartered Accountants, 8th Floor,63 Albert St, Auckland | Physical | 10 Jul 2002 - 20 Feb 2003 |
Gosling Chapman, Chartered Accountants, 8th Floor, 63 Albert St, Auckland 1 | Registered | 10 Jul 2002 - 20 Feb 2003 |
Symmetry Accounting Limited, Chartered Accountants, 560 Rosebank Road, Auckland | Registered & physical | 28 Aug 2001 - 10 Jul 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Woods, Ian Individual |
Ponsonby Auckland 1021 |
28 Aug 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sparrow, Eugene Francis Individual |
C/-45 Lincoln Street Ponsonby Auckland 1021 |
08 Mar 2007 - 14 Sep 2021 |
Woods, Ian Individual |
45 Lincoln Street Ponsonby Auckland 1021 |
19 Jul 2006 - 14 Sep 2021 |
Olson, Janene Mary Individual |
C/-142 Golf Road Titirangi, Auckland |
19 Jul 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Douglas Nutrition Limited Central Park Drive, Lincoln |
|
Graeme Douglas Investments Limited Central Park Drive, Lincoln |
|
Lincolnshire Limited 53 Lincoln Street |
|
Team Lincoln Holdings Limited 53 Lincoln Street |
|
Stebian Limited 53 Lincoln Street |
|
53 Limited 53 Lincoln Street |
Bear Broking Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |
Tmr Limited 4 Sefton Avenue |
Capybara Mortgages Limited 23 Rona Avenue |
Kinloch Partners Limited Level 6, 36 Kitchener Street |
Mortgage Scene Limited 8 Telford Ave |
Ccnz Finance Limited 8f 300 Queen Street |