Jack Turner 2001 Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429036727650) was incorporated on 08 Nov 2001. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 18 Maniapoto Street, Otorohanga (type: registered, physical). C/O Bailey Ingham, 18 Maniopoto St, Otorohanga had been their physical address, until 29 Apr 2003. 3000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 2700 shares (90% of shares), namely:
Bailey Ingham Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Otorohanga postcode 3900,
Adam, Karl Douglas (an individual) located at Matiere postcode 3995. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 5% of all shares (150 shares); it includes
Adam, Karl Douglas (an individual) - located at Matiere. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allotment (150 shares, 5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Macdonald, Patricia Ginnette, located at Matiere (an individual). Businesscheck's data was last updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
18 Maniapoto Street, Otorohanga | Registered & physical & service | 29 Apr 2003 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Karl Douglas Adam
Matiere, 3977
Address used since 27 Apr 2016
Matiere, 3995
Address used since 25 Apr 2018 |
Director | 08 Nov 2001 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/o Bailey Ingham, 18 Maniopoto St, Otorohanga | Physical | 09 Nov 2001 - 29 Apr 2003 |
C/o Bailey Ingham, 18 Maniopoto St, Otorohanga | Registered | 08 Nov 2001 - 29 Apr 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bailey Ingham Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038320804 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Otorohanga 3900 |
19 Jul 2010 - current |
Adam, Karl Douglas Individual |
Matiere 3995 |
08 Nov 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Adam, Karl Douglas Individual |
Matiere 3995 |
08 Nov 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Macdonald, Patricia Ginnette Individual |
Matiere 3995 |
22 Apr 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Adam, Karl Douglas Individual |
Matiere |
22 Apr 2004 - 22 Apr 2004 |
Bailey Ingham Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038320804 Company Number: 808581 Entity |
22 Apr 2004 - 22 Apr 2004 | |
Bailey Ingham Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038320804 Company Number: 808581 Entity |
22 Apr 2004 - 22 Apr 2004 |
Caiseal Trustee Company Limited 18 Maniapoto Street |
|
Love Your Business Hoogstra Limited 18 Maniapoto Street |
|
Catch Charters (2017) Limited 18 Maniapoto Street |
|
Freken Investments Limited 18 Maniapoto Street |
|
Hawk 2000 Limited 18 Maniapoto Street |
|
Height Access Limited 18 Maniapoto Street |