Paula Ryan Limited (NZBN 9429036625543) was incorporated on 01 Mar 2002. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Floor 4, 3 Ferncroft Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, registered). Harbourside Business Park, 527A Rosebank Road, Avondale had been their registered address, up to 07 Aug 2019. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 49 shares (49% of shares), namely:
Dallimore, Robert Ashley (an individual) located at Matarangi, Whitianga postcode 3592. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 51% of all shares (51 shares); it includes
Ryan, Paula Ann (an individual) - located at Matarangi, Whitianga. Our data was last updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 4, 3 Ferncroft Street, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered & service | 07 Aug 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paula Ann Ryan
Matarangi, Whitianga, 3592
Address used since 24 Feb 2016 |
Director | 01 Mar 2002 - current |
Robert Ashley Dallimore
Matarangi, Whitianga, 3592
Address used since 24 Feb 2016 |
Director | 15 Oct 2003 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Harbourside Business Park, 527a Rosebank Road, Avondale, 1026 | Registered & physical | 13 Feb 2014 - 07 Aug 2019 |
10a Westech Place, Kelston, Waitakere, 0620 | Physical & registered | 10 Aug 2010 - 13 Feb 2014 |
18 Garfield Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 14 Aug 2009 - 10 Aug 2010 |
Level 1, 33 Garfield Street, Parnell | Registered & physical | 21 Aug 2008 - 14 Aug 2009 |
5 Akaroa Street, Parnell, Auckland | Registered & physical | 20 Aug 2004 - 21 Aug 2008 |
Level One, Victoria House, 23 Victoria Street East, Auckland | Registered & physical | 01 Mar 2002 - 20 Aug 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dallimore, Robert Ashley Individual |
Matarangi Whitianga 3592 |
01 Mar 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ryan, Paula Ann Individual |
Matarangi Whitianga 3592 |
01 Mar 2002 - current |
Taheke Forest Limited 483d Rosebank Road |
|
Duggan Family Trustees Limited 483d Rosebank Road |
|
Squash Xl Limited 483d Rosebank Road |
|
Knezovich Holdings Limited 483d Rosebank Road |
|
Waterview Consulting Limited 483d Rosebank Road |
|
Impact Development Training Limited 483d Rosebank Road |