Truweld Engineering Kerikeri (2002) Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429036615001) was registered on 15 Feb 2002. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 34 Orchid Drive, Paeroa, Paeroa, 3600 (type: registered, service). 9 Hobson Avenue, Kerikeri, Kerikeri had been their registered address, until 14 Feb 2023. 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Barker, Graham George (an individual) located at Paeroa, Paeroa postcode 3600. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (500 shares); it includes
Barker, Lynnette Sybil (an individual) - located at Paeroa, Paeroa. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 24 Apr 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
9 Hobson Avenue, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 | Physical | 27 Feb 2015 |
34 Orchid Drive, Paeroa, Paeroa, 3600 | Registered & service | 14 Feb 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Lynnette Sybil Barker
Paeroa, Paeroa, 3600
Address used since 01 Jun 2022
Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230
Address used since 01 Jan 2018
Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230
Address used since 29 Feb 2016 |
Director | 15 Feb 2002 - current |
Graham George Barker
Paeroa, Paeroa, 3600
Address used since 01 Jun 2022
Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230
Address used since 01 Jan 2018
Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230
Address used since 29 Feb 2016 |
Director | 15 Feb 2002 - current |
11 Maritime Lane , Waipapa , Waipapa , 0230 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
9 Hobson Avenue, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 | Registered & service | 27 Feb 2015 - 14 Feb 2023 |
Barrie Price & Associates Limited, Chartered Accountants, 309b Pollen Street, Thames | Registered & physical | 23 Mar 2007 - 27 Feb 2015 |
C/- Price & Barker, 309 Polen Street, Thames | Physical & registered | 15 Feb 2002 - 23 Mar 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Barker, Graham George Individual |
Paeroa Paeroa 3600 |
15 Feb 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Barker, Lynnette Sybil Individual |
Paeroa Paeroa 3600 |
15 Feb 2002 - current |
Ruatane Limited 9 Hobson Avenue |
|
Rear Properties Limited 9 Hobson Avenue |
|
The Garth Woollams Trustee Company Limited 9 Hobson Avenue |
|
Bay Of Islands Bakeries (2010) Limited 9 Hobson Avenue |
|
Taraire Farm Holdings Limited 9 Hobson Avenue |
|
Sn Communications Limited 9 Hobson Avenue |