The Copier Company Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429036496600) was started on 20 May 2002. 6 addresess are in use by the company: 57 Vanguard Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 (type: postal, office). 9 Sovereign Street, Nelson had been their physical address, up until 06 Mar 2013. 1000 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 120 shares (12% of shares), namely:
Hymers Holding Limited (an entity) located at Richmond, Appleby postcode 7020. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 22% of all shares (220 shares); it includes
Allan, Marion (an individual) - located at Britannia Heights, Nelson. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allotment (220 shares, 22%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Brady, Christina Mary, located at Stoke, Nelson (an individual). "Office machinery or equipment hiring" (business classification L663937) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to The Copier Company Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
104 Princes Drive, Britannia Heights, Nelson, 7010 | Registered & physical & service | 06 Mar 2013 |
57 Vanguard Street, Nelson, Nelson, 7010 | Postal & office & delivery & invoice | 18 Feb 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Trevor Alexander Allan
Britannia Heights, Nelson, 7010
Address used since 26 Feb 2013 |
Director | 20 May 2002 - current |
Christina Mary Brady
Stoke, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 27 Feb 2012 |
Director | 20 May 2002 - current |
Marion Allan
Britannia Heights, Nelson, 7010
Address used since 26 Feb 2013 |
Director | 20 May 2002 - current |
Michael James Brady
Stoke, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 27 Feb 2012 |
Director | 20 May 2002 - current |
Timothy Lee Hymers
Appleby, Richmond, 7020
Address used since 21 Jul 2021
Richmond, Richmond, 7020
Address used since 01 Feb 2019 |
Director | 01 Feb 2019 - current |
57 Vanguard Street , Nelson , Nelson , 7010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
9 Sovereign Street, Nelson | Physical & registered | 20 May 2002 - 06 Mar 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hymers Holding Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047129214 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Richmond Appleby 7020 |
08 Feb 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Allan, Marion Individual |
Britannia Heights Nelson 7010 |
20 May 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brady, Christina Mary Individual |
Stoke Nelson 7011 |
20 May 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brady, Michael James Individual |
Stoke Nelson 7011 |
20 May 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Allan, Trevor Alexander Individual |
Britannia Heights Nelson 7010 |
20 May 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hymers Holding Trust Other |
01 Feb 2019 - 08 Feb 2019 |
Valet Properties Limited 104 Princes Drive |
|
Better Leasing Limited 104 Princes Drive |
|
Timatanga 2020 Limited 104a Princes Drive |
|
Mark Dowson & Co Limited 92 Princes Drive |
|
Te Oramamaku Holdings Limited 86 Princes Drive |
|
Watermanz Limited 31 Richardson Street |
Nph Limited Suite 1, 126 Trafalgar Street |
Featherston Street Holdings Limited 303 Willis Street |
Av Media Auckland Limited 160 Onslow Road |
Tamure Limited 6/25 Centennial Highway |
Fenceless Limited 54 Penryn Drive |
Pof Holding Limited 1st Floor, 1 Cambridge Terrace |