Morgan Enterprises Limited (NZBN 9429036436477) was launched on 05 Jul 2002. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, 5 Hunt Street, Whangarei, 0140 (type: registered, physical). 1A Douglas Street, Kensington, Whangarei had been their registered address, up until 02 Mar 2022. Morgan Enterprises Limited used more aliases, namely: Word Of Mouth Plumbing Limited from 05 Jul 2002 to 18 Dec 2007. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Savill-Morgan, Lynaire (an individual) located at Kerikeri postcode 0294. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Morgan, Scott Alex (an individual) - located at Kerikeri. "Beef cattle farming" (ANZSIC A014220) is the classification the ABS issued to Morgan Enterprises Limited. Our data was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 5 Hunt Street, Whangarei, 0140 | Registered & physical & service | 02 Mar 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Scott Alex Morgan
Kerikeri, 0294
Address used since 18 Nov 2020
Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230
Address used since 27 Nov 2019
Cable Bay, Cable Bay, 0420
Address used since 23 Nov 2015 |
Director | 05 Jul 2002 - current |
Lynaire Ann Savill-morgan
Kerikeri, 0294
Address used since 18 Nov 2020
Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230
Address used since 27 Nov 2019
Cable Bay, Cable Bay, 0420
Address used since 23 Nov 2015 |
Director | 27 Jul 2012 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1a Douglas Street, Kensington, Whangarei, 0112 | Registered & physical | 01 Aug 2019 - 02 Mar 2022 |
10 Fairway Drive, Kerikeri, 0230 | Physical & registered | 01 Apr 2015 - 01 Aug 2019 |
6 Redan Road, Kaitaia, 0410 | Registered & physical | 22 Nov 2011 - 01 Apr 2015 |
C/-bray Cormack & Dow, Chartered Accountants, 6 Redan Road, Kaitaia | Registered & physical | 03 Sep 2008 - 22 Nov 2011 |
Korff Associates, Unit F, 402 Titirangi Road, Titirangi Village, Auckland | Registered & physical | 30 Nov 2004 - 03 Sep 2008 |
711 South Titirangi Road, Titirangi, Auckland | Registered & physical | 10 Oct 2003 - 30 Nov 2004 |
26 Humphrey Kemp Avenue, Henderson, Auckland | Registered & physical | 05 Jul 2002 - 10 Oct 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Savill-morgan, Lynaire Individual |
Kerikeri 0294 |
19 Jun 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morgan, Scott Alex Individual |
Kerikeri 0294 |
05 Jul 2002 - current |
Jr Plant & Equipment Limited 10 Fairway Drive |
|
Cook Family Trustee Limited 10 Fairway Drive |
|
Connemara Black Trustees Limited 10 Fairway Drive |
|
Seal Equities Limited 10 Fairway Drive |
|
Ww Trustee Services 2013 Limited 10 Fairway Drive |
|
D S A Northland Limited 10 Fairway Drive |
Urlich Brothers Limited 10 Fairway Drive |
Walter Farms Limited 10 Fairway Drive |
Ora Ora Farms Limited 10 Fairway Drive |
Mokau Station Limited 10 Fairway Drive |
Tapuwae Farms Limited 10 Fairway Drive |
D G Dixon & Son Limited 10 Fairway Drive |