Tamahere Investments Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429036376209) was started on 22 Aug 2002. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 107 Mays Road, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 (type: registered, physical). 107 Mays Road, Onehunga, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 30 Jul 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 0 shareholders who belong to 0 shareholder groups. "Holiday house and flat operation" (ANZSIC H440030) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Tamahere Investments Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 25 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
107 Mays Road, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 | Postal & office & delivery | 22 Jul 2020 |
107 Mays Road, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 | Registered & physical & service | 30 Jul 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Frederick David Power
Greenlane, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 06 Apr 2023
Onehunga, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 01 Apr 2015 |
Director | 22 Aug 2002 - current |
Eileen Joy Aitchison
Onehunga, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 06 Apr 2023
Onehunga, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 01 Apr 2015 |
Director | 22 Aug 2002 - current |
107 Mays Road , Onehunga , Auckland , 1061 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
107 Mays Road, Onehunga, Auckland | Physical | 23 Aug 2002 - 30 Jul 2020 |
107 Mays Road, Onehunga, Auckland | Registered | 22 Aug 2002 - 30 Jul 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Power, Frederick David Individual |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 |
22 Aug 2002 - 01 Jul 2019 |
Power, Frederick David Individual |
Onehunga Auckland |
22 Aug 2002 - 01 Jul 2019 |
Power, Frederick David Individual |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 |
22 Aug 2002 - 01 Jul 2019 |
Aitchison, Eileen Joy Individual |
Onehunga Auckland |
22 Aug 2002 - 01 Jul 2019 |
Aitchison, Eileen Joy Individual |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 |
22 Aug 2002 - 01 Jul 2019 |
Trustee Holdings Limited Other |
22 Aug 2002 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Barrowman, Averil Denise Individual |
Onehunga Auckland |
03 Apr 2008 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Barlow, Mary Helen Individual |
Sandringham Auckland 1025 |
02 Jun 2009 - 05 Jul 2022 |
Aitchison, Eileen Joy Individual |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 |
22 Aug 2002 - 01 Jul 2019 |
Barlow, Mary Helen Individual |
Avondale Auckland |
02 Jun 2009 - 05 Jul 2022 |
Barlow, Mary Helen Individual |
Sandringham Auckland 1025 |
02 Jun 2009 - 05 Jul 2022 |
Power, Frederick David Individual |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 |
22 Aug 2002 - 01 Jul 2019 |
Aitchison, Eileen Joy Individual |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 |
22 Aug 2002 - 01 Jul 2019 |
Null - Trustee Holdings Limited Other |
22 Aug 2002 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Racebred Limited 107 Mays Rd |
|
Titirangi Promotions Limited 107 Mays Road |
|
Aircon Flange Limited 113 Mays Road |
|
Mowbray Holdings Limited 7 Malvern St |
|
Sullivan Plumbing & Gas Limited 115 Mays Road |
|
Sullivan Sheetmetals Limited 115 Mays Road |
Rnb Properties Limited 27c Athens Road |
Neka Trustee Limited 163 Arthur Street |
Matai Ridge Wanaka Limited 14 William Avenue |
W&s Development Limited 6b Tawera Road |
Smart Progressive Limited 20b Hillsborough Road |
Whitesky Investments Limited 25 Ranfurly Road |