Luantim Properties Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429036279340) was launched on 25 Oct 2002. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 4, 123 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 (type: physical, service). Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road, Northcote, Christchurch had been their physical address, until 28 Apr 2022. 1000 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 998 shares (99.8 per cent of shares), namely:
Alexander, David Kipp (an individual) located at Mount Pleasant, Christchurch postcode 8081,
Nicholl, Susan Elizabeth (an individual) located at Rd 1, Lyttelton postcode 8971,
Nicholl, Robert William (an individual) located at Rd 1, Lyttelton postcode 8971. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Nicholl, Robert William (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Lyttelton. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Nicholl, Susan Elizabeth, located at Rd 1, Lyttelton (an individual). The Businesscheck data was updated on 24 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 123 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical & service & registered | 28 Apr 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Robert William Nicholl
Rd 1, Lyttelton, 8971
Address used since 25 Nov 2011 |
Director | 25 Oct 2002 - current |
Susan Elizabeth Nicholl
Rd 1, Lyttelton, 8971
Address used since 25 Nov 2011 |
Director | 25 Oct 2002 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road, Northcote, Christchurch, 8052 | Physical & registered | 07 Dec 2017 - 28 Apr 2022 |
41a Sawyers Arms Road, Northcote, Christchurch, 8052 | Physical & registered | 07 Dec 2012 - 07 Dec 2017 |
154 Tuam Street, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 25 Oct 2002 - 07 Dec 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alexander, David Kipp Individual |
Mount Pleasant Christchurch 8081 |
12 Oct 2007 - current |
Nicholl, Susan Elizabeth Individual |
Rd 1 Lyttelton 8971 |
12 Oct 2007 - current |
Nicholl, Robert William Individual |
Rd 1 Lyttelton 8971 |
12 Oct 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Nicholl, Robert William Individual |
Rd 1 Lyttelton 8971 |
25 Oct 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Nicholl, Susan Elizabeth Individual |
Rd 1 Lyttelton 8971 |
25 Oct 2002 - current |
Zrk Limited Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road |
|
Ashgrove Holdings Chch Limited Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road |
|
South Beach Forest Land Limited Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road |
|
Tasman Holdings (chch) Limited Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road |
|
Greatplains Property Lunns Limited Unit 1, 41 Sawyers Arms Road |
|
Alexander Holdings Limited 41a Sawyers Arms Road |