Stuart Taylor Builders Limited (NZBN 9429036260157) was incorporated on 05 Nov 2002. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 (type: physical, registered). Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings had been their physical address, up until 02 Oct 2019. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Taylor, Stuart Trevor (an individual) located at Havelock North postcode 4130. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Taylor, Catherine Margaret (an individual) - located at Havelock North. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered & service | 02 Oct 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Catherine Margaret Taylor
Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 09 May 2018
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 28 Sep 2011 |
Director | 05 Nov 2002 - current |
Stuart Trevor Taylor
Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 09 May 2018
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 28 Sep 2011 |
Director | 05 Nov 2002 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Building A, Level 1, Farming House, 211 Market Street South, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered | 09 Mar 2018 - 02 Oct 2019 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Registered | 01 Oct 2013 - 09 Mar 2018 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Registered | 12 Aug 2010 - 01 Oct 2013 |
208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings, 4122 | Physical | 12 Aug 2010 - 09 Mar 2018 |
Whk Coffey Davidson, 208-210 Avenue Road East, Hastings | Registered & physical | 01 Aug 2007 - 12 Aug 2010 |
Coffey Davidson Limited, 303n Karamu Road, Hastings | Registered & physical | 05 Nov 2002 - 01 Aug 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Taylor, Stuart Trevor Individual |
Havelock North 4130 |
05 Nov 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Taylor, Catherine Margaret Individual |
Havelock North 4130 |
05 Nov 2002 - current |
Black Folder Limited Building A, Level 1, Farming House |
|
Poukawa Holdings Limited 211 Market Street |
|
David Brownrigg Investments Limited Farming House |
|
Farming House Limited 211 Market Street South |
|
Kiwiwines2u Limited Building A, Level 1, Farming House |
|
Brownrigg Agriculture Limited 211 Market Street South |