Blue Fern Realty Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429036219940) was registered on 27 Nov 2002. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 2, 18 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, Westgate Chambers, 3A/2 Maki Street Westgate Centre, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 04 May 2021. Blue Fern Realty Limited used other aliases, namely: Henderson Real Estate Limited from 27 Nov 2002 to 02 Nov 2006. 25000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1250 shares (5% of shares), namely:
Labuschagne, Martin Daniel (an individual) located at Schnapper Rock, Auckland postcode 0632. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 60% of all shares (15000 shares); it includes
Bray, Suzanne (an individual) - located at Massey, Auckland. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (8750 shares, 35%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Newell, Darren Keith, located at Huapai, Kumeu (an individual). Our data was last updated on 05 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 18 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical & service | 04 May 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Suzanne Maree Bray
Massey, Auckland, 0614
Address used since 19 Jul 2019 |
Director | 19 Jul 2019 - current |
Joseph William Voordouw
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 19 Jul 2019 |
Director | 19 Jul 2019 - 28 Apr 2023 |
Richard Philip Freeman
Henderson, Waitakere, 0612
Address used since 10 Nov 2007 |
Director | 27 Nov 2002 - 19 Jul 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, Westgate Chambers, 3a/2 Maki Street Westgate Centre, Auckland, 0814 | Physical & registered | 24 Aug 2018 - 04 May 2021 |
Level 1, Westgate Chambers, Maki Street, Westgate Centre, Waitakere City, 0814 | Registered & physical | 10 Aug 2017 - 24 Aug 2018 |
Level 1, Westgate Chambers, Maki Street, Westgate Centre, Waitakere City, 0614 | Physical & registered | 12 Oct 2016 - 10 Aug 2017 |
Level 1, Westgate Chambers, Main Street, Westgate Centre, Waitakere City, 0614 | Registered & physical | 06 Sep 2007 - 12 Oct 2016 |
C/o Chapmans Chartered Accountants Ltd, Level 1, Market Precinct, Westgate, Centre, Westgate Dr, Waitakere City | Registered & physical | 03 Jan 2003 - 06 Sep 2007 |
404 Great North Road, Henderson, Auckland | Registered & physical | 27 Nov 2002 - 03 Jan 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Labuschagne, Martin Daniel Individual |
Schnapper Rock Auckland 0632 |
23 Aug 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bray, Suzanne Individual |
Massey Auckland 0614 |
24 Aug 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Newell, Darren Keith Individual |
Huapai Kumeu 0810 |
29 Nov 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Voordouw, Joseph William Individual |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
26 Jul 2019 - 23 May 2023 |
Voordouw, Joseph William Individual |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
26 Jul 2019 - 23 May 2023 |
Cheryl Jocelyn, Freeman Individual |
Henderson Auckland 0612 |
25 Nov 2003 - 26 Jul 2019 |
Davenports West Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036219087 Company Number: 1260488 Entity |
Henderson Auckland |
25 Nov 2003 - 26 Jul 2019 |
Freeman, Richard Philip Individual |
Henderson Auckland 0612 |
25 Nov 2003 - 26 Jul 2019 |
Freeman, Richard Philip Individual |
Henderson Auckland 0612 |
25 Nov 2003 - 26 Jul 2019 |
Cheryl Jocelyn, Freeman Individual |
Henderson Auckland 0612 |
25 Nov 2003 - 26 Jul 2019 |
Cheryl Jocelyn, Freeman Individual |
Henderson Auckland 0612 |
25 Nov 2003 - 26 Jul 2019 |
Freeman, Richard Philip Individual |
Henderson Auckland 0612 |
25 Nov 2003 - 26 Jul 2019 |
Davenports West Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036219087 Company Number: 1260488 Entity |
Henderson Auckland 0610 |
25 Nov 2003 - 26 Jul 2019 |
Moore Investments 2013 Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Utopia Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
The Hillside Trust Company Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Underground Earthworks Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Bush Rd Tyres & Alignment Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |
|
Bruce Howlett Limited Level 1, Westgate Chambers |