Gear Holdings Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429036214730) was started on 04 Dec 2002. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 11 Taumaru Avenue, Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013 (type: registered, physical). 9 Balgownie Grove, Naenae, Lower Hutt had been their registered address, up to 19 Sep 2022. 120 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 120 shares (100% of shares), namely:
O'neil, Peter William (an individual) located at Petone, Lower Hutt postcode 5012. "Rental of commercial property" (ANZSIC L671250) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Gear Holdings Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
11 Taumaru Avenue, Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013 | Registered & physical & service | 19 Sep 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter William O'neil
Petone, Lower Hutt, 5012
Address used since 01 Sep 2022
Naenae, Lower Hutt, 5011
Address used since 23 Mar 2011 |
Director | 04 Dec 2002 - current |
Brian James Aitken
City Beach, Perth, 6015
Address used since 01 May 2018 |
Director | 01 May 2018 - current |
Karen Maree Wilson
Lowry Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013
Address used since 01 May 2018 |
Director | 01 May 2018 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
9 Balgownie Grove, Naenae, Lower Hutt, 5011 | Registered & physical | 13 Jul 2011 - 19 Sep 2022 |
9 Taumaru Avenue, Lowry Bay, Eastbourne, Wellington | Physical | 27 Apr 2006 - 13 Jul 2011 |
C/- The Offices Of, Kendons Chartered Accountants, 69 Rutherford Street, Lower Hutt | Physical | 24 Mar 2004 - 27 Apr 2006 |
9 Taumaru Avenue, Lowry Bay, Eastbourne, Wellington | Registered | 20 Dec 2002 - 13 Jul 2011 |
9 Taumaru Avenue, Lowry Bay, Eastbourne, Wellington | Physical | 20 Dec 2002 - 24 Mar 2004 |
Offices Of Kendons Chartered Accountants, 69 Rutherford Street, Lower Hutt | Registered & physical | 04 Dec 2002 - 20 Dec 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'neil, Peter William Individual |
Petone Lower Hutt 5012 |
04 Dec 2002 - current |
Yuzuco NZ Limited 7 Balgownie Grove |
|
Zenith Seeds Limited 7 Balgownie Grove |
|
Hco Corporation Limited 6 Balgownie Grove |
|
Charlie Rose Properties Limited 25 Waddington Drive |
|
Danube Limited 32 Waddington Drive |
|
Pfmb Properties Limited 29 Summit Road |
Hall Properties (2001) Limited 1 Clendon Street |
G & D Ritchie Holdings Limited 22 Tilbury Street |
Park Ave Investments Limited 14 Derwent Lee Grove |
Eng Taing Investment Limited 25 Everest Avenue |
Wilrol Properties Limited 62 Norton Park Avenue |
Elegance World Limited 35 Hillary Court |