Mangapoi Station Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429036211067) was registered on 04 Dec 2002. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 1866 Tapuaeroa Road, Rd 3, Ruatoria, 4083 (type: physical, registered). 1866 Tapuaeroa Road, R D 3, Ruatoria had been their physical address, up to 14 Jul 2011. 1000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 998 shares (99.8 per cent of shares), namely:
Aupouri, Mohi (a director) located at Ruatoria postcode 4083. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Aupouri, Mohi (a director) - located at Ruatoria. The next group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Aupouri, Phillip Graham, located at Ruatoria (an individual). Businesscheck's information was last updated on 01 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1866 Tapuaeroa Road, Rd 3, Ruatoria, 4083 | Physical & registered & service | 14 Jul 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mohi Aupouri
Ruatoria, 4083
Address used since 27 Apr 2016 |
Director | 18 Dec 2003 - current |
Mabel Aupouri
Gisborne, 4010
Address used since 27 Apr 2016 |
Director | 04 Dec 2002 - 04 Jul 2022 |
Phillip Graham Aupouri
Ruatoria,
Address used since 18 Dec 2003 |
Director | 18 Dec 2003 - 29 Jun 2011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1866 Tapuaeroa Road, R D 3, Ruatoria | Physical & registered | 06 Jun 2003 - 14 Jul 2011 |
52 Paraone Road, Gisborne | Physical & registered | 04 Dec 2002 - 06 Jun 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Aupouri, Mohi Director |
Ruatoria 4083 |
01 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Aupouri, Mohi Director |
Ruatoria 4083 |
01 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Aupouri, Phillip Graham Individual |
Ruatoria 4083 |
01 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Aupouri, Mabel Individual |
Gisborne |
04 Dec 2002 - 07 Mar 2024 |