Karaka Bay Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429036093519) was started on 10 Mar 2003. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 7, 55 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). Level 7, 55 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 11 Mar 2020. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Boyens, Philippa Jane (an individual) located at Karaka Bays, Wellington postcode 6022,
Simon, Gregory John (an individual) located at Karaka Bays, Wellington postcode 6022. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 7, 55 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 11 Mar 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Philippa Boyens
Karaka Bays, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 12 Apr 2010 |
Director | 10 Mar 2003 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 7, 55 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 10 Sep 2018 - 11 Mar 2020 |
Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 16 Jul 2014 - 10 Sep 2018 |
Level 6, 51shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 01 Apr 2014 - 16 Jul 2014 |
Level 6, 51-53 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 05 Apr 2011 - 01 Apr 2014 |
Whk, Level 6, 51-53 Shortland Street, Auckland 1010 | Physical & registered | 19 Apr 2010 - 05 Apr 2011 |
Whk Gosling Chapman, Level 6, 51-53 Shortland Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 03 Apr 2008 - 19 Apr 2010 |
Gosling Chapman -a Division Of Whk (nz), Limited, Level 6, 51-53 Shortland Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 13 Mar 2006 - 03 Apr 2008 |
Gosling Chapman Limited, Level 6, 51-53 Shortland Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 09 Sep 2003 - 13 Mar 2006 |
Level 8. 63 Albert St, Auckland | Physical & registered | 10 Mar 2003 - 09 Sep 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Boyens, Philippa Jane Individual |
Karaka Bays Wellington 6022 |
02 Jul 2020 - current |
Simon, Gregory John Individual |
Karaka Bays Wellington 6022 |
02 Jul 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Boyens, Phillippa Individual |
Karaka Bays Wellington 6022 |
10 Mar 2003 - 02 Jul 2020 |
Simon, Gregory Individual |
Karaka Bays Wellington 6022 |
31 Mar 2011 - 02 Jul 2020 |
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited Level 6, 59 High Street |
|
Maui Finance Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited Level 14, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
|
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited Level 15, 126 Vincent Street |