Midas New Zealand Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429036046454) was registered on 04 Apr 2003. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Unit H, 40-42 Constellation Drive, Rosedale, North Shore, 0632 (type: office, delivery). Unit 1/5 Ceres Court, Rosedale, North Shore had been their physical address, until 12 Feb 2014. Midas New Zealand Limited used other aliases, namely: Automotive Franchise Holdings Limited from 04 Apr 2003 to 26 Jun 2003. 99 shares are allotted to 7 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 30 shares (30.3 per cent of shares), namely:
Chapmans Trustees Limited (an entity) located at 3A/2 Maki Street Westgate Centre, Auckland postcode 0814,
Millar, Barry John (an individual) located at West Harbour, Auckland postcode 0618,
Millar, Leanne Wendy (an individual) located at West Harbour, Auckland postcode 0618. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33 per cent of all shares (exactly 33 shares); it includes
Emm Three Limited (an entity) - located at Milford, Auckland. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (3 shares, 3.03%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Millar, Barry John, located at West Harbour, Auckland (an individual). "Franchisors nec" (ANZSIC L664075) is the classification the ABS issued Midas New Zealand Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit H, 40-42 Constellation Drive, Rosedale, North Shore, 0632 | Registered & physical & service | 12 Feb 2014 |
Unit H, 40-42 Constellation Drive, Rosedale, North Shore, 0632 | Office & delivery | 04 Feb 2020 |
P O Box 305521, Triton Plaza, North Shore, 0757 | Postal | 04 Feb 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David Michael John Houldsworth
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 02 Feb 2010 |
Director | 04 Apr 2003 - current |
Barry John Millar
West Harbour, Auckland, 0618
Address used since 17 Dec 2004 |
Director | 04 Apr 2003 - current |
Pauline Jennifer Horne
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 28 Apr 2014 |
Director | 28 Apr 2014 - current |
Gregory Richard Horne
Parnell, Auckland,
Address used since 04 Oct 2005 |
Director | 04 Apr 2003 - 18 Mar 2014 |
Hugh Green
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 02 Feb 2010 |
Director | 04 Apr 2003 - 29 Jun 2012 |
Unit H, 40-42 Constellation Drive , Rosedale , North Shore , 0632 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 1/5 Ceres Court, Rosedale, North Shore, 0632 | Physical & registered | 03 Nov 2010 - 12 Feb 2014 |
19 Tarndale Grove, Albany, Aucklnad | Registered | 30 Oct 2006 - 03 Nov 2010 |
19 Tarndale Grove, Albany, Auckland | Physical | 30 Oct 2006 - 03 Nov 2010 |
28 Mortimer Pass, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical & registered | 30 Jan 2004 - 30 Oct 2006 |
Level 9, 8-10 Whitaker Place, Auckland | Physical & registered | 04 Apr 2003 - 30 Jan 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chapmans Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035810544 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
3a/2 Maki Street Westgate Centre Auckland 0814 |
17 Aug 2017 - current |
Millar, Barry John Individual |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 |
04 Apr 2003 - current |
Millar, Leanne Wendy Individual |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 |
15 Dec 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Emm Three Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037791582 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
04 Apr 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Millar, Barry John Individual |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 |
04 Apr 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Houldsworth, Honor Joan Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
15 Dec 2004 - current |
Houldsworth, David Michael John Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
15 Dec 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Swan Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039821911 Company Number: 279861 Entity |
04 Apr 2003 - 15 Dec 2004 | |
Croaghmore Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036044696 Company Number: 1289905 Entity |
04 Apr 2003 - 23 Jul 2012 | |
Hugh Green Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037975197 Company Number: 880720 Entity |
04 Apr 2003 - 23 Jul 2012 | |
Chapman, Graham Clyde Individual |
Westharbour Auckland |
04 Apr 2003 - 17 Aug 2017 |
Swan Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039821911 Company Number: 279861 Entity |
04 Apr 2003 - 15 Dec 2004 | |
Croaghmore Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036044696 Company Number: 1289905 Entity |
04 Apr 2003 - 23 Jul 2012 | |
Noakes, Robert Manwarring Individual |
Oraki Auckland |
15 Dec 2004 - 09 May 2014 |
Hugh Green Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037975197 Company Number: 880720 Entity |
04 Apr 2003 - 23 Jul 2012 |
Lakeview Contractors Limited 19 Tarndale Grove |
|
Pleroo Park Management Limited 7 Tarndale Grove |
|
The Topstone Limited 7 Tarndale Grove |
|
Jachin Homes Limited 7 Tarndale Grove |
|
Newman Incorporation Limited 7 Tarndale Grove |
|
Berechiah Developments Limited 7 Tarndale Grove |
Pform.nz Limited 52 Rising Parade |
Cambridge Leases Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
Kreem Franchising 2008 Limited 121 Oraha Road |
Paisen Limited Flat 1, 66 Glenmall Place |
Myept Limited 3 Tolich Place |
Safety Fall Bags & Nets Master Dealership Limited Shop 12 |