Ballarat Investments Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429036008582) was started on 06 May 2003. 3 addresses are in use by the company: Level 18, 151 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: service, registered). Level 18, Sap Tower, 151 Queen Street, Auckland had been their service address, until 31 May 2023. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Thompson, Brent Murray (an individual) located at Glendowie, Auckland postcode 1071. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Thompson, Jillian Gay (an individual) - located at Glendowie, Auckland. Our information was updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 18, Sap Tower, 151 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 21 Oct 2022 |
Level 18, 151 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 19 May 2023 |
Level 18, 151 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Service | 31 May 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jillian Gay Thompson
Glendowie, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Mar 2024
Glendowie, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 21 Mar 2013 |
Director | 06 May 2003 - current |
Brent Murray Thompson
Glendowie, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Mar 2024
Glendowie, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 21 Mar 2013 |
Director | 06 May 2003 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 18, Sap Tower, 151 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Service | 21 Oct 2022 - 31 May 2023 |
24-26 Pollen Street, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021 | Registered & physical | 19 Aug 2014 - 21 Oct 2022 |
Level One, 53 King Street, Frankton, Hamilton | Registered & physical | 17 Jan 2008 - 19 Aug 2014 |
John C R Barraclough & Associates, 240 Tristram Street, Hamilton | Registered & physical | 03 Apr 2007 - 17 Jan 2008 |
C/- Withers Tsang & Co Limited, 24-26 Pollen Street, Ponsonby, Auckland | Physical | 07 May 2003 - 03 Apr 2007 |
C/- Withers Tsang & Co Limited, 24-26 Pollen Street, Ponsonby, Auckland | Registered | 06 May 2003 - 03 Apr 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thompson, Brent Murray Individual |
Glendowie Auckland 1071 |
06 May 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thompson, Jillian Gay Individual |
Glendowie Auckland 1071 |
06 May 2003 - current |
Bob's Properties Limited 24-26 Pollen Street |
|
Bloomfields Garden Centre Limited 24-26 Pollen Street |
|
Ns Seven Holdings Limited 24-26 Pollen St |
|
Find My Limited 24-26 Pollen Street |
|
Aspiring Building Consultants Limited 24-26 Pollen Street |
|
Duthie And Associates Limited 24-26 Pollen Street |