Concertina Productions Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429035996224) was incorporated on 30 May 2003. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 277 Pigs Head Road, Rd 4, Hikurangi, 0184 (type: registered, physical). 277 Pigs Head Road, Rd 4, Hikurangi had been their registered address, up until 10 Jul 2018. Concertina Productions Limited used more names, namely: Mass Media Art Projects Limited from 05 Apr 2018 to 17 Apr 2018, The Beoperation Corporation Limited (02 Nov 2005 to 05 Apr 2018) and Lumino Studio Limited (22 Sep 2005 - 02 Nov 2005). 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Cameron, Cleve Robert (an individual) located at Rd 4, Hikurangi postcode 0184. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Cameron, Willa Kathryn (an individual) - located at Rd 4, Hikurangi. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 06 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
277 Pigs Head Road, Rd 4, Hikurangi, 0184 | Service & physical | 06 May 2016 |
277 Pigs Head Road, Rd 4, Hikurangi, 0184 | Registered | 10 Jul 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Cleve Robert Cameron
Rd 4, Hikurangi, 0184
Address used since 30 May 2016 |
Director | 30 May 2003 - current |
Willa Kathryn Cameron
Rd 4, Hikurangi, 0184
Address used since 05 Apr 2018 |
Director | 05 Apr 2018 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
277 Pigs Head Road, Rd 4, Hikurangi, 0184 | Registered | 06 May 2016 - 10 Jul 2018 |
82 Victoria Road, Devonport, Auckland, 0624 | Registered & physical | 11 Jun 2012 - 06 May 2016 |
6 Victory Road, Laingholm, Waitakere, 0604 | Physical & registered | 19 May 2011 - 11 Jun 2012 |
3 Ocean Road, Paekakariki, Wellington, 5034 | Registered & physical | 11 Jul 2008 - 19 May 2011 |
272 State Highway 10, Mangonui, Northland | Registered & physical | 02 May 2008 - 11 Jul 2008 |
8 Limetree Lane, Harewood, Christchuch | Physical | 07 Jul 2006 - 02 May 2008 |
8 Limetree Lane, Harewood, Christchurch | Registered | 07 Jul 2006 - 02 May 2008 |
36 Opanuku Rd, Waitakere, 1008, Auckalnd | Registered & physical | 07 Nov 2005 - 07 Jul 2006 |
115 Hornsey Road, Melrose, Wellington | Registered & physical | 29 Aug 2003 - 07 Nov 2005 |
134b Flat 3, Evans Bay Parade, Roseneath, Wellington | Registered & physical | 30 May 2003 - 29 Aug 2003 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cameron, Cleve Robert Individual |
Rd 4 Hikurangi 0184 |
10 May 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cameron, Willa Kathryn Individual |
Rd 4 Hikurangi 0184 |
30 May 2016 - current |
Ryan Parsons Builders Limited 274 Pigs Head Road |
|
Alicat Limited Pigs Head Road |
|
T D Projects Limited 100 Pigs Head Road |
|
Studio 152 Limited 152 Pigs Head Road |
|
Gray Dewar Plumbing Limited 333 Pigs Head Road |
|
Pigs Head Concrete Limited 345 Pigs Head Road |