Up2It Access Hire Limited (issued a business number of 9429035913801) was incorporated on 24 Jun 2003. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 58097, Botany, Auckland, 2163 (type: postal, delivery). Spartik Trust, Level 2, Spartik House, 6 Edward Wayte Place, Grafton, Auckland had been their physical address, until 05 May 2020. Up2It Access Hire Limited used more aliases, namely: Kiwi Roofing Holdings Limited from 24 Jun 2003 to 27 Oct 2011. 20000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 20000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Acrow Group Limited (an entity) located at Mt Wellington, Auckland postcode 1060. Our database was updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
7-8 Monahan Road, Mt Wellington, Auckland, 1060 | Physical & registered & service | 05 May 2020 |
Po Box 58097, Botany, Auckland, 2163 | Postal | 15 May 2020 |
45 Greenmount Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Delivery & office | 15 May 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Rohitesh Permal Reddy
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 03 Sep 2019 |
Director | 03 Sep 2019 - current |
Mark James Irvine
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 30 Oct 2020
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 06 Sep 2019 |
Director | 06 Sep 2019 - current |
Brett Allan Russell
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 06 Sep 2019 |
Director | 06 Sep 2019 - current |
Paul John Connell
Rd 1, Howick, 2571
Address used since 28 May 2014 |
Director | 24 Jun 2003 - 06 Sep 2019 |
45 Greenmount Drive , East Tamaki , Auckland , 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Spartik Trust, Level 2, Spartik House, 6 Edward Wayte Place, Grafton, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 24 Sep 2019 - 05 May 2020 |
16 Elliott Street, Papakura | Registered & physical | 24 Jun 2003 - 24 Sep 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Acrow Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047382077 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mt Wellington Auckland 1060 |
16 Sep 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Connell, John Edward Individual |
Pakuranga |
24 Jun 2003 - 22 Feb 2010 |
Professional Trustee Services 2016 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042058229 Company Number: 5838789 Entity |
Papakura Auckland 2110 |
07 Nov 2016 - 16 Sep 2019 |
Connell, Paul John Individual |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 |
24 Jun 2003 - 16 Sep 2019 |
Professional Trustee Services 2016 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042058229 Company Number: 5838789 Entity |
Papakura Auckland 2110 |
07 Nov 2016 - 16 Sep 2019 |
Connell, Paul John Individual |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 |
24 Jun 2003 - 16 Sep 2019 |
Connell, Nicola Individual |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 |
19 May 2004 - 16 Sep 2019 |
Connell, Nicola Individual |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 |
19 May 2004 - 16 Sep 2019 |
Connell, Paul John Individual |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 |
24 Jun 2003 - 16 Sep 2019 |
Effective Date | 31 Aug 2019 |
Name | Acrow Group Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 7386857 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
7-8 Monahan Road Mt Wellington Auckland 1060 |
Rosie Enterprises Limited 16 Elliott Street |
|
Moontan Properties Limited 16 Elliott Street |
|
Insane Investments Limited 16 Elliott Street |
|
Kid's Klub New Zealand Limited 16 Elliot Street |
|
Dynamic Market Systems Limited Suite 1, 16 Elliot Street |
|
White Star Products Limited Partnership Skipper Lay & Associates |