Life Map Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429035794660) was registered on 23 Sep 2003. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 38 Ogilvy Terrace, Plimmerton, Wellington, 5026 (type: postal, office). 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Wineera, Evelyn Herani (a director) located at Plimmerton, Porirua postcode 5026. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Mulvihill, Francis John (an individual) - located at Plimmerton, Wellington. "Footwear wholesaling" (business classification F371220) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Life Map Limited. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 31 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
38 Ogilvy Terrace, Plimmerton, Wellington | Registered & physical & service | 23 Sep 2003 |
38 Ogilvy Terrace, Plimmerton, Wellington, 5026 | Postal & office & delivery | 09 Nov 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Francis John Mulvihill
Plimmerton, Wellington, 5026
Address used since 23 Sep 2003 |
Director | 23 Sep 2003 - current |
Evelyn Herani Wineera
Plimmerton, Porirua, 5026
Address used since 09 Jul 2018 |
Director | 09 Jul 2018 - current |
Fogalepolo Lepou
Palmerston North,
Address used since 23 Sep 2003 |
Director | 23 Sep 2003 - 31 Mar 2007 |
Johnny Isiah Godinet
Woburn, Lower Hutt,
Address used since 23 Sep 2003 |
Director | 23 Sep 2003 - 31 Mar 2004 |
38 Ogilvy Terrace , Plimmerton , Wellington , 5026 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wineera, Evelyn Herani Director |
Plimmerton Porirua 5026 |
10 Jul 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mulvihill, Francis John Individual |
Plimmerton Wellington |
23 Sep 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Godinet, Johnny Isiah Individual |
Woburn Lower Hutt |
23 Sep 2003 - 19 Oct 2005 |
Lepou, Fogalepolo Individual |
Palmerston North |
23 Sep 2003 - 19 Oct 2005 |
Triple Threat Limited 38 Ogilvy Terrace |
|
Gap Qa Limited 36 Ogilvy Terrace |
|
Sharon Matich Trustee Co. Limited 81 Gordon Road |
|
Goff And Gone Limited 53 Gordon Road |
|
Air Lift Products And Services Limited 55 Gordon Road |
|
Your Choice Charters Limited Gordon Road |
Boarder Distribution Limited 505 High Street |
Bene Footwear Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
Global Footcare (nz) Limited 61a Emerald Hill Drive |
As Much Limited Level 1, 19 Edward Street |
Bata Company (n.z.) Limited 3 Bata Place |
Red Fox Investments Limited 5 Edmundson Street |