Maxwells Golf Retreat Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429035729785) was registered on 24 Oct 2003. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 205B Ingram Road, Rd 3, Bombay, 2579 (type: registered, physical). 83B Ingram Road, Rd 3, Bombay had been their registered address, up to 24 Oct 2019. 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 99 shares (99% of shares), namely:
Arnold, Colleen (an individual) located at Ellerslie, Auckland postcode 1051,
Maxwell, Kaye (an individual) located at Rd 3, Drury postcode 2579. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Maxwell, Kaye (an individual) - located at Rd 3, Drury. Our data was updated on 25 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
205b Ingram Road, Rd 3, Bombay, 2579 | Service & physical | 10 Aug 2018 |
205b Ingram Road, Rd 3, Bombay, 2579 | Registered | 24 Oct 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kaye Maxwell
Rd 3, Drury, 2579
Address used since 01 Jul 2011 |
Director | 24 Oct 2003 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
83b Ingram Road, Rd 3, Bombay, 2579 | Registered | 10 Aug 2018 - 24 Oct 2019 |
217 King Street, Pukekohe, 2120 | Registered & physical | 22 Jun 2015 - 10 Aug 2018 |
Ingram Road, Rd 3, Drury 2579 | Physical & registered | 21 Apr 2010 - 22 Jun 2015 |
C/-drk Chartered Accountants Ltd, 83b Ingram Road, R D 3, Drury 2579 | Registered | 10 Jul 2009 - 21 Apr 2010 |
C/-duthie/taylor-ruiterman, Chartered Accountants, 83b Ingram Road, Rd 3 Drury | Registered | 02 Sep 2008 - 10 Jul 2009 |
205b Ingram Road, Rd3 Drury | Registered | 29 Jun 2007 - 02 Sep 2008 |
205b Ingram Road, Rd3 Drury | Physical | 29 Jun 2007 - 21 Apr 2010 |
1 Stembridge Avenue, Pukekohe | Registered & physical | 15 Feb 2005 - 29 Jun 2007 |
66 King Street, Pukekohe | Physical & registered | 24 Oct 2003 - 15 Feb 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Arnold, Colleen Individual |
Ellerslie Auckland 1051 |
24 Oct 2003 - current |
Maxwell, Kaye Individual |
Rd 3 Drury 2579 |
24 Oct 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Maxwell, Kaye Individual |
Rd 3 Drury 2579 |
24 Oct 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bunt, Lyall Individual |
Ellerslie Auckland |
24 Oct 2003 - 22 Jul 2010 |
Envoy Limited 217 King Street |
|
Elegant Spaces Limited 217 King Street |
|
Mezzanine Hair (2010) Limited 217 King Street |
|
Ls Electrical Services Limited 217 King Street |
|
Engine Room NZ Limited 217 King Street |
|
Pitch Limited 217 King Street |