Talwar Investments Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429035557654) was registered on 10 Feb 2004. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 1 Arapiki Way, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 (type: postal, office). 1 Arapiki Way, Enner Glynn, Nelson had been their physical address, up until 20 Aug 2008. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Talwar, Renu (an individual) located at Stoke, Nelson 7011. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Talwar, Radha Krishan (an individual) - located at Stoke, Nelson 7011. "Family welfare service nec" (ANZSIC Q879043) is the classification the ABS issued Talwar Investments Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 31 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1 Arapiki Way, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 | Physical & registered & service | 20 Aug 2008 |
1 Arapiki Way, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 | Postal & office & delivery | 09 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Radha Krishan Talwar
Stoke, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 13 Aug 2008 |
Director | 10 Feb 2004 - current |
Renu Talwar
Stoke, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 13 Aug 2008 |
Director | 10 Feb 2004 - current |
1 Arapiki Way , Stoke , Nelson , 7011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1 Arapiki Way, Enner Glynn, Nelson | Physical & registered | 14 Feb 2008 - 20 Aug 2008 |
No 8, Kipling Crescent, Stoke, Nelson | Physical & registered | 10 Feb 2004 - 14 Feb 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Talwar, Renu Individual |
Stoke Nelson 7011 |
10 Feb 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Talwar, Radha Krishan Individual |
Stoke Nelson 7011 |
10 Feb 2004 - current |
Carte & Company Limited 2 Arapiki Way |
|
Pockets Holdings Limited 31 Arapiki Road |
|
Hcjc & Co Limited 88 Coster Street |
|
Jayne D'arcy Trust 21 Matangi Street |
|
Nelson Multiple Sclerosis Society Incorporated 19 Arapiki Road |
|
Br Malcolm Foundation 35 Calamaras Street |
Family Friend Supervised Contact (2014) Limited 1b Ohariu Road |
Community Healthcare Limited 23 Humphreys Grove |
Family Heart Limited 22b Sea Vista Drive |
Mediation New Zealand Limited 34 Saxton Road |
K&l Olsen Trustee Limited 53 Brougham Street |
D&c Nelson Trustee Limited 140 Tebbutt Road |