Foreland Holdings Limited (issued a business number of 9429035415589) was started on 25 May 2004. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 9 Greenhithe, Waihola, 9243 (type: registered, physical). 11 North Foreland, Waihola had been their registered address, until 01 Jul 2020. 200 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 40 shares (20% of shares), namely:
Anderton, Ivan Lindsay (an individual) located at Waihola postcode 9243. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 80% of all shares (exactly 160 shares); it includes
Anderton, Sharron Dawn (an individual) - located at Waihola. Businesscheck's data was updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
9 Greenhithe Street, Milton, 9073 | Service & physical | 04 Jul 2019 |
9 Greenhithe, Waihola, 9243 | Registered | 01 Jul 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Sharron Dawn Anderton
Waihola, Outram, 9243
Address used since 23 Jun 2020
Waihola, Outram, 9073
Address used since 06 Jul 2016 |
Director | 25 May 2004 - current |
Ivan Lindsay Anderton
Waihola, 9243
Address used since 23 Jun 2020
Waihola, 9243
Address used since 06 Jul 2016
Waihola, 9243
Address used since 26 Jun 2017 |
Director | 25 May 2004 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
11 North Foreland, Waihola, 9243 | Registered | 14 Jul 2014 - 01 Jul 2020 |
11 North Foreland, Waihola, 9243 | Physical | 14 Jul 2014 - 04 Jul 2019 |
Sumpter Moore, 5 Eden Street, Milton | Registered & physical | 03 Aug 2007 - 14 Jul 2014 |
63 Eglinton Road, Mornington, Dunedin | Registered | 27 May 2005 - 03 Aug 2007 |
Craig Paddon Lawyer, 63 Eglinton Road, Mornington, Dunedin | Physical | 27 May 2005 - 03 Aug 2007 |
Craig Paddon Lawyer, 27 Mailer Street, Mornington, Dunedin | Physical & registered | 25 May 2004 - 27 May 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anderton, Ivan Lindsay Individual |
Waihola 9243 |
25 May 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anderton, Sharron Dawn Individual |
Waihola 9243 |
25 May 2004 - current |
Waihola Surfacing Limited 8 Margate Street |
|
Waihola Motors (2006) Limited 9 Greenhithe Street |
|
Waihola Contracting Limited 61 Beacon Street |
|
Christian Youth Camps Waihola Incorporated 70 Finlayson Road |
|
Central Lifestyles Limited 23 Surrey Bay Road |
|
Southern Lifestyle Limited 23 Surrey Bay Road |