Wairua Creative Retreat Limited (issued a business number of 9429035340041) was started on 10 Jun 2004. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 123 Hurndall Street, Maungaturoto, Maungaturoto, 0520 (type: physical, registered). 123 Hurndall Street, Maungaturoto, Maungaturoto had been their physical address, until 11 Aug 2021. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 10 shares (10 per cent of shares), namely:
Mcrae, Louise Heather (an individual) located at Wellsford postcode 0972. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 90 per cent of all shares (90 shares); it includes
Mcrae, Louise Heather (an individual) - located at Wellsford,
Gladwell, Hugh Kenneth (an individual) - located at Queen Street, Warkworth. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 07 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
123 Hurndall Street, Maungaturoto, Maungaturoto, 0520 | Physical & registered & service | 11 Aug 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Louise Heather Mcrae
Wellsford, 0972
Address used since 07 Aug 2020
Rd 5, Warkworth, 0985
Address used since 07 Sep 2011 |
Director | 10 Jun 2004 - current |
Hamish Ross Williamson
Onehunga, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 10 Sep 2009 |
Director | 10 Jun 2004 - 06 Sep 2011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
123 Hurndall Street, Maungaturoto, Maungaturoto, 0520 | Physical & registered | 14 Sep 2016 - 11 Aug 2021 |
7 Torea Road, Rd 5, Warkworth, 0985 | Physical & registered | 14 Sep 2011 - 14 Sep 2016 |
407 Leigh Road, Rd5, Warkworth | Physical & registered | 17 Sep 2009 - 14 Sep 2011 |
14 Gordon Craig Place, Algies Bay, Warkworth | Registered & physical | 05 Nov 2008 - 17 Sep 2009 |
251 Old Coach Road, Whitianga | Registered & physical | 10 Jun 2004 - 05 Nov 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcrae, Louise Heather Individual |
Wellsford 0972 |
10 Jun 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcrae, Louise Heather Individual |
Wellsford 0972 |
10 Jun 2004 - current |
Gladwell, Hugh Kenneth Individual |
Queen Street Warkworth |
10 Jun 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Williamson, Hamish Ross Individual |
Onehunga Auckland |
10 Jun 2004 - 15 Nov 2011 |
Kiwi Farms Limited 123 Hurndall Street |
|
Stephen M Jaques Limited 123 Hurndall Street |
|
Ob Com Limited 123 Hurndall Street |
|
North Harbour Weed Control Limited 123 Hurndall Street |
|
Kiwi Flower Company Limited 123 Hurndall Street |
|
Garnerdale Farm Limited 123 Hurndall Street |