Upcroft Investments Limited (NZBN 9429035249092) was registered on 05 Aug 2004. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Ridge House, 69 Ridge Road, Howick, Auckland, 2014 (type: physical, service). Ridge House, 69 Ridge Road, Howick, Auckland had been their registered address, until 08 Nov 2016. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 10 shares (1% of shares), namely:
Houghton, Noel David (an individual) located at The Wood, Nelson postcode 7010. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 99% of all shares (exactly 990 shares); it includes
Houghton, Elsie Thurza (an individual) - located at The Wood, Nelson. Our data was updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Ridge House, 69 Ridge Road, Howick, Auckland, 2014 | Physical & service & registered | 08 Nov 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Noel David Houghton
Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach, 3611
Address used since 19 Mar 2024
The Wood, Nelson, 7010
Address used since 20 Oct 2021
Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 12 Apr 2016
Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach, 3611
Address used since 01 Aug 2017 |
Director | 05 Aug 2004 - current |
Elsie Thurza Houghton
Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach, 3611
Address used since 19 Mar 2024
The Wood, Nelson, 7010
Address used since 20 Oct 2021
Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach, 3611
Address used since 01 Aug 2017
Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 12 Apr 2016 |
Director | 05 Aug 2004 - current |
Emma Victoria Houghton
The Wood, Nelson, 7010
Address used since 23 Mar 2021
Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 12 Apr 2016 |
Director | 19 Sep 2007 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Ridge House, 69 Ridge Road, Howick, Auckland, 2014 | Registered & physical | 12 May 2010 - 08 Nov 2016 |
25 Picton Street, Howick, Manukau 2014 | Physical & registered | 30 Apr 2007 - 12 May 2010 |
Unit 1b ,cook Apartments, 24 James Cook Crescent, Remuera, Auckland | Registered & physical | 10 Nov 2005 - 30 Apr 2007 |
26 Beach Road, Howick, Auckland | Physical & registered | 05 Aug 2004 - 10 Nov 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Houghton, Noel David Individual |
The Wood Nelson 7010 |
05 Aug 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Houghton, Elsie Thurza Individual |
The Wood Nelson 7010 |
05 Aug 2004 - current |
Teklon Immigration Services Limited Ridge House, 69 Ridge Road |
|
Payless Plumbing Limited Ridge House, 69 Ridge Road |
|
Reacher Investments Limited Ridge House, 69 Ridge Road |
|
Aj Property Services Limited Ridge House, 69 Ridge Road |
|
Smart Farm Systems Limited Ridge House, 69 Ridge Road |
|
Maxline Limited Ridge House, 69 Ridge Road |