Vivi Investments Limited (issued a business number of 9429035237464) was incorporated on 27 Aug 2004. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 6 Cebel Place, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 (type: registered, physical). Level 2, 507 Lake Road, Takapuna, Auckland had been their physical address, until 15 Nov 2021. Vivi Investments Limited used more aliases, namely: Liese Family Trustees Limited from 06 Oct 2005 to 05 Nov 2021, Mahler & Mccauley Builders Limited (27 Aug 2004 to 06 Oct 2005). 1000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Balzat, Vivian (an individual) located at Rd 2, Dairy Flat postcode 0792. Businesscheck's information was updated on 31 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
6 Cebel Place, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical & service | 15 Nov 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Uwe Balzat
Rd 2, Dairy Flat, 0792
Address used since 05 Nov 2021 |
Director | 05 Nov 2021 - 01 Sep 2022 |
Annette Liese
Takapuna, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 01 Oct 2015 |
Director | 06 Oct 2005 - 05 Nov 2021 |
Peter Max Liese
Takapuna, Auckland,
Address used since 06 Oct 2005 |
Director | 06 Oct 2005 - 20 Dec 2013 |
Micha Mahler
Silverdale, Auckland,
Address used since 27 Aug 2004 |
Director | 27 Aug 2004 - 06 Oct 2005 |
Ian James Mccauley
Hillcrest, Auckland,
Address used since 27 Aug 2004 |
Director | 27 Aug 2004 - 06 Oct 2005 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 507 Lake Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Physical & registered | 31 Aug 2017 - 15 Nov 2021 |
6 Cebel Place, Albany, Auckland | Registered & physical | 27 Aug 2004 - 31 Aug 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Balzat, Vivian Individual |
Rd 2 Dairy Flat 0792 |
05 Nov 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Balzat, Vivian Individual |
Albany Auckland |
27 Aug 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Liese, Annette Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
06 Oct 2005 - 05 Nov 2021 |
Liese, Annette Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
06 Oct 2005 - 05 Nov 2021 |
Balzat, Vivian Individual |
Rd 2 Albany 0792 |
24 Jan 2014 - 20 Oct 2017 |
Liese, Peter Max Individual |
Takapuna Auckland |
06 Oct 2005 - 24 Jan 2014 |
Liese, Peter Max Individual |
Takapuna Auckland |
06 Oct 2005 - 24 Jan 2014 |
Balzat, Uwe Individual |
Albany Auckland |
27 Aug 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Oasis Building Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035264040 Company Number: 1538707 Entity |
27 Aug 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Oasis Building Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035264040 Company Number: 1538707 Entity |
27 Aug 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Hamblin, Marion Individual |
Rd 2 Albany 0792 |
06 Jun 2014 - 20 Oct 2017 |
Hamblin, Marion Individual |
Rd 2 Albany 0792 |
24 Jan 2014 - 05 Jun 2014 |
Crawfords Souvenirs Limited Level 1, 507 Lake Road |
|
Fit Futures Learning Institute Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |
|
Portland Holdings Trustee Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |
|
Sayles Corporate Trustee Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |
|
Signcraftsmen Hamilton Limited Level 1, 6 Como Street |
|
Shipco Transport Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |