33 Ardmore St Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429035222163) was started on 19 Aug 2004. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 2, 11-17 Church Street, Queenstown, 9300 (type: physical, registered). Level 3 Mountaineer, 32 Rees St, Queenstown had been their registered address, up to 05 Mar 2014. 300 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 300 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Alco Holdings Ltd (an other) located at 32 Rees Street, Queenstown postcode 9300. Our data was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 11-17 Church Street, Queenstown, 9300 | Physical & registered & service | 05 Mar 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alastair James Spary
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 21 Oct 2009 |
Director | 19 Aug 2004 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3 Mountaineer, 32 Rees St, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered & physical | 07 Apr 2011 - 05 Mar 2014 |
C/o G S Mclauchlan & Co, Level 1, Plaza House, 243 Princes Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 26 Nov 2010 - 07 Apr 2011 |
C/o G S Mclauchlan & Co, Stafford House, 2 Stafford Street, Dunedin | Physical & registered | 05 Mar 2010 - 26 Nov 2010 |
3rd Floor/2 Stafford Street, Dunedin | Registered & physical | 19 Aug 2004 - 05 Mar 2010 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alco Holdings Ltd Other (Other) |
32 Rees Street Queenstown 9300 |
19 Aug 2004 - current |
Name | Alco Holdings Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1361424 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Aurora Vineyard Limited Level 2, 11-17 Church Street |
|
Mt Rosa Water Limited Level 3, 11-17 Church Street |
|
Hamilton & Co Limited Level 2, 11-17 Church Street |
|
The Body Mechanics Limited Level 1, 8 Church Street |
|
Fuse Electrical Golden Bay Limited Level 2, 11-17 Church Street |
|
Novena Property NZ Limited Level 2, 11-17 Church Street |