Agrifocus Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429035142447) was incorporated on 06 Oct 2004. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 25D Victoria Avenue, Invercargill, 9810 (type: physical, registered). 117 Spey Street, Invercargill had been their physical address, up until 17 Jul 2018. 100 shares are allocated to 6 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (1 per cent of shares), namely:
Mcdonough, Barbara Frances (an individual) located at Waikiwi, Invercargill postcode 9810. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 51 per cent of all shares (51 shares); it includes
Bekhuis, Jeremy Richard John (an individual) - located at West Plains, Invercargill. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (16 shares, 16%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Wood, Campbell Murray, located at Invercargill (an individual). Businesscheck's data was last updated on 03 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
25d Victoria Avenue, Invercargill, 9810 | Physical & registered & service | 17 Jul 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jeremy Richard John Bekhuis
West Plains, Invercargill, 9810
Address used since 17 Apr 2024
Grasmere, Invercargill, 9810
Address used since 22 May 2017
Waikiwi, Invercargill, 9810
Address used since 21 Apr 2020 |
Director | 22 May 2017 - current |
Brett Ronald Mcdonough
Gladstone, Invercargill, 9810
Address used since 01 Apr 2010 |
Director | 06 Oct 2004 - 29 Jun 2017 |
Jennifer Margaret Jean Jane
East Gore, Gore, 9710
Address used since 01 Apr 2010 |
Director | 20 Apr 2005 - 27 Aug 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
117 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 | Physical & registered | 23 Feb 2017 - 17 Jul 2018 |
28 Mersey Street, Gore, 9710 | Registered | 12 Apr 2010 - 23 Feb 2017 |
28 Mersey Street, Gore | Physical | 06 May 2005 - 23 Feb 2017 |
Agrifocus Ltd, 28 Mersey Stree, Gore | Registered | 06 May 2005 - 12 Apr 2010 |
41 Alice Street, Invercargill | Physical & registered | 06 Oct 2004 - 06 May 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcdonough, Barbara Frances Individual |
Waikiwi Invercargill 9810 |
06 Apr 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bekhuis, Jeremy Richard John Individual |
West Plains Invercargill 9810 |
29 May 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wood, Campbell Murray Individual |
Invercargill 9872 |
21 Apr 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcdonough, Brett Ronald Individual |
Waikiwi Invercargill 9810 |
06 Oct 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcdonough, Brett Ronald Individual |
Waikiwi Invercargill 9810 |
06 Oct 2004 - current |
Mcdonough, Barbara Frances Individual |
Waikiwi Invercargill 9810 |
06 Apr 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Scott, Malcolm Individual |
Invercargill |
04 Aug 2006 - 04 Aug 2006 |
Scott, Suhasini Individual |
Invercargill |
04 Aug 2006 - 04 Aug 2006 |
Bekhuis, Jeremy Richard John Individual |
Waikiwi Invercargill 9810 |
29 May 2017 - 21 Apr 2020 |
Mackenzie, Graeme Donald Individual |
Gore |
06 Apr 2006 - 28 Aug 2015 |
Scott, Suhasini Individual |
Invercargill |
04 Aug 2006 - 04 Aug 2006 |
Bekhuis, Lena Katrin Individual |
Waikiwi Invercargill 9810 |
29 May 2017 - 21 Apr 2020 |
Jane, Jennifer Margaret Jean Individual |
Gore |
28 Mar 2006 - 28 Aug 2015 |
Gray, David John Individual |
Gore |
06 Apr 2006 - 28 Aug 2015 |
Alexander, Trevor Neil Individual |
R D 2 Tapanui |
06 Apr 2006 - 06 Apr 2006 |
Brock, Annette Joy Individual |
Rd 2 Tapanui |
28 Mar 2006 - 06 Apr 2006 |
Back 9 Design Limited 107-109 Spey Street |
|
Financial Services South Limited 118 Spey Street |
|
Ilt Foundation Ward Adams Bryan-lamb |
|
Southland Maritime Vhf Users Association Incorporated Cargill Chambers |
|
Southland Free Kindergarten Association Incorporated C/o Messrs Mcculloch & Partners |
|
Cra8 Rock Lobster Industry Association Incorporated C/o Mcculloch & Partners |