Warren and Mahoney Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429035024699) was launched on 17 Jan 2005. 3 addresses are in use by the company: 139 Pakenham Street West, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: other, other). 16 Southwark Street, Christchurch had been their physical address, up to 13 Nov 2015. Warren and Mahoney Limited used other names, namely: Warren and Mahoney Services Limited from 26 Nov 2008 to 01 Dec 2009, Ingenar Limited (17 Jan 2005 to 26 Nov 2008). 3710500 shares are allocated to 36 shareholders who belong to 20 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 250000 shares (6.74 per cent of shares), namely:
Andrew Tu'inukuafe (an individual) located at Hauraki, Auckland postcode 0622,
Shale Chambers (an individual) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 4.34 per cent of all shares (161000 shares); it includes
Katherine Skipper (an individual) - located at Paraparaumu, Paraparaumu. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (161000 shares, 4.34%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Daryl Maguire, located at South Yarra, Victoria (a director). The Businesscheck data was last updated on 18 Sep 2021.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
254 Montreal Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical | 13 Nov 2015 |
139 Pakenham Street West, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Other (Address For Share Register) & other (Address for Records) (Address For Share Register) | 29 Nov 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John Edward Coop
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 01 Nov 2014 |
Director | 01 Apr 2005 - current |
Graeme Ross Livingstone Finlay
Ilam, Christchurch, 8041
Address used since 06 Nov 2013 |
Director | 24 May 2007 - current |
Peter Lane Marshall
Northwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 03 Jul 2013 |
Director | 25 Nov 2008 - current |
Andrew Lewis Barclay
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 06 Nov 2013 |
Director | 19 Oct 2009 - current |
Ralph Owen Roberts
Karori, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 01 Feb 2010 |
Director | 19 Oct 2009 - current |
Blair David Johnston
Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 01 Apr 2013
Freeman's Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 01 Mar 2019 |
Director | 01 Apr 2013 - current |
Richard Ian Leggat
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 25 Jan 2018 |
Director | 25 Jan 2018 - current |
Daryl Michael Maguire
South Yarra, Victoria, 3141
Address used since 01 Nov 2019 |
Director | 01 Nov 2019 - current |
Andrew Soape Tu'inukuafe
Rd 2, Piha, 0772
Address used since 01 Apr 2021 |
Director | 01 Apr 2021 - current |
Margaret Anne Blackburn
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 18 Apr 2011 |
Director | 18 Apr 2011 - 30 Oct 2020 |
Gavin Martin Kain
Erskineville, Nsw, 2043
Address used since 24 Apr 2018 |
Director | 24 Apr 2018 - 23 Aug 2019 |
Garry Alexander Duncan
Harewood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 18 Apr 2011 |
Director | 18 Apr 2011 - 31 Mar 2017 |
William John Gregory
Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 01 Feb 2010 |
Director | 01 Apr 2005 - 31 Mar 2016 |
Ian John Adamson
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 01 Nov 2011 |
Director | 24 May 2007 - 31 Mar 2016 |
Bren Warrick Morrison
Rd 2, Albany 0792,
Address used since 29 Jan 2010 |
Director | 24 Nov 2008 - 01 Apr 2013 |
Roy Shelton Redrup Wilson
Korokoro, Lower Hutt, 5012
Address used since 01 Feb 2010 |
Director | 01 Apr 2005 - 18 Apr 2011 |
Juliet Mary Broad Mckee
Rd 1, Greytown, 5794
Address used since 30 Jul 2010 |
Director | 19 Oct 2009 - 18 Apr 2011 |
Garry Alexander Duncan
Harewood, Christchurch,
Address used since 17 Jan 2005 |
Director | 17 Jan 2005 - 24 Nov 2008 |
Barry John Dacombe
Christchurch,
Address used since 17 Jan 2005 |
Director | 17 Jan 2005 - 24 Nov 2008 |
Andrew Lewis Barclay
Ponsonby, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Apr 2005 |
Director | 01 Apr 2005 - 30 Sep 2005 |
Bren Warrick Morrison
Rd2, Albany, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Apr 2005 |
Director | 01 Apr 2005 - 30 Sep 2005 |
254 Montreal Street , Christchurch , 8013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
16 Southwark Street, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical & registered | 18 Jul 2014 - 13 Nov 2015 |
30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical | 06 Dec 2012 - 18 Jul 2014 |
30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered | 07 Nov 2011 - 18 Jul 2014 |
131 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Registered | 17 Jan 2005 - 07 Nov 2011 |
131 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Physical | 17 Jan 2005 - 06 Dec 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew Soape Tu'inukuafe Individual |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 |
28 Nov 2019 - current |
Shale Chambers Individual |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
28 Jun 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Katherine Margaret Skipper Individual |
Paraparaumu Paraparaumu 5032 |
28 Jun 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Daryl Michael Maguire Director |
South Yarra Victoria 3141 |
28 Jun 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Aj Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036786169 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
172 Ponsonby Road Ponsonby |
01 Apr 2019 - current |
Liberty Jane Haselden Individual |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 |
01 Apr 2019 - current |
Blair David Johnston Director |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 |
16 Oct 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Marshall Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
18 Jun 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fiona Jane Gibb Individual |
St Albans Christchurch |
03 Nov 2006 - current |
Elizabeth-anne Gregory Individual |
St Albans Christchurch |
03 Nov 2006 - current |
William John Gregory Individual |
St Albans Christchurch |
12 Aug 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Marshall Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
18 Jun 2007 - current |
Ralph Owen Roberts Individual |
Karori Wellington 6012 |
26 Jan 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew Lewis Barclay Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
12 Aug 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cambel Charles Ferguson Individual |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 |
23 Nov 2020 - current |
Andrew Lewis Barclay Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
12 Aug 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ralph Owen Roberts Individual |
Karori Wellington 6012 |
26 Jan 2010 - current |
Richard Norman Martin Individual |
Karori Wellington 6012 |
22 Aug 2017 - current |
Julia Katherine Roberts Individual |
Karori Wellington 6012 |
30 May 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jane Christina Mowat Marshall Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
05 Jul 2016 - current |
Antony Charles Vernon Brown Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
05 Jul 2016 - current |
Peter Marshall Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
18 Jun 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Graeme Ross Livingstone Finlay Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 |
18 Jun 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ian John Adamson Individual |
Rd 1 Queenstown 9371 |
26 Jan 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ralph Owen Roberts Individual |
Karori Wellington 6012 |
25 Nov 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
John Edward Coop Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
12 Aug 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Noble Investment Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031785211 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
37 Galway Street, Takutai Square Auckland 1010 |
02 Oct 2013 - current |
Catherine Shirley Long Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
03 Nov 2006 - current |
John Edward Coop Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
12 Aug 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Blair David Johnston Director |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 |
16 Oct 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Elizabeth Anne Finlay Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 |
05 Jul 2016 - current |
Graeme Ross Livingstone Finlay Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 |
18 Jun 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Banco Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037369569 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
20 Eden Street Oamaru Null |
16 Oct 2013 - current |
Ian John Adamson Individual |
Rd 1 Queenstown 9371 |
26 Jan 2010 - current |
Nicola Sarah Adamson Individual |
Rd 1 Queenstown 9371 |
16 Oct 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew Soape Tu'inukuafe Individual |
Hauraki Auckland 0622 |
28 Nov 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bren Warrick Morrison Individual |
Rd 2 Albany 0792 |
12 Aug 2005 - 25 Nov 2018 |
William John Gregory Individual |
St Albans Christchurch |
18 Jun 2007 - 28 Sep 2016 |
Alan James Mcmaster Individual |
Christchurch 2 |
12 Aug 2005 - 31 Oct 2011 |
Geoffrey Christopher Currie Individual |
Ponsonby Auckland |
03 Nov 2006 - 08 Jun 2010 |
Foss Michael Shannahan Individual |
Korokoro Wellington |
18 Jun 2007 - 27 Apr 2018 |
Grant Ashley Cameron Individual |
22 Moorhouse Avenue Christchurch 8140 |
12 Aug 2005 - 23 Nov 2020 |
Garry Alexander Duncan Individual |
Harewood Christchurch |
17 Jan 2005 - 27 Apr 2018 |
Raewyn Jeanette Lovett Individual |
Milford Auckland 0620 |
10 Jun 2010 - 02 Oct 2013 |
Grant Ashley Cameron Individual |
22 Moorhouse Avenue Christchurch 8140 |
12 Aug 2005 - 23 Nov 2020 |
Julia Kathryn Roberts Individual |
Karori Wellington 6012 |
22 Aug 2017 - 30 May 2018 |
Roy Shelton Redrup Wilson Individual |
Korokoro Wellington |
12 Aug 2005 - 27 Apr 2018 |
Michelle Francesca Fraser Individual |
St Martins Christchurch |
03 Nov 2006 - 16 Feb 2017 |
Mary-ann Duncan Individual |
Harewood Christchurch |
03 Nov 2006 - 16 Feb 2017 |
Craig Allan Cox Individual |
Waimairi Beach Christchurch 8083 |
07 Jun 2012 - 25 Nov 2015 |
Philip Seldon Grey Individual |
Beckenham Christchurch 8023 |
26 Jan 2010 - 25 Nov 2015 |
Jonathan Paul Hewlett Individual |
Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 |
26 Jan 2010 - 25 Nov 2015 |
Richard Wright Vere Mcgowan Individual |
Park Terrace Christchurch 8052 |
26 Jan 2010 - 25 Nov 2015 |
Barry John Dacombe Individual |
Christchurch |
17 Jan 2005 - 31 Oct 2011 |
Adamson Family Trust Other |
09 Oct 2013 - 16 Oct 2013 | |
Null - Adamson Family Trust Other |
09 Oct 2013 - 16 Oct 2013 | |
Alexander David Couchman Individual |
Belmont Auckland |
26 Jan 2010 - 07 Jun 2012 |
Marilyn Dorothy Dacombe Individual |
Christchurch 2 |
12 Aug 2005 - 31 Oct 2011 |
Warren And Mahoney Services Limited 254 Montreal Street |
|
Yamamoto Limited 254 Montreal Street |
|
Gpr Hunter Trustees Limited 254 Montreal Street |
|
Range Capital Limited 254 Montreal Street |
|
K & A Trustees (2005) Limited 254 Montreal Street |
|
Warren And Mahoney Architects Limited 254 Montreal Street |