Subbie Franchise Group Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429035015802) was incorporated on 23 Dec 2004. 1 address is currently in use by the company: Level 3, Pwc Centre, Cnr Ward Street & Anglesea Street, Hamilton, 3204 (type: registered, physical). Pricewaterhousecoopers, 109 Ward Street, Hamilton had been their registered address, until 07 Nov 2014. 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Kevin Stanley (an individual) located at Matamata. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Jennian Group Limited (an entity) - located at Cnr Ward & Anglesea Streets, Hamilton. Our database was updated on 06 Apr 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 3, Pwc Centre, Cnr Ward Street & Anglesea Street, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & physical | 07 Nov 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kevin Thomas Stanley
Matamata, 3400
Address used since 01 Jun 2015 |
Director | 23 Dec 2004 - current |
Richard George Carver
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 01 Apr 2016 |
Director | 01 Apr 2005 - current |
Anthony Joseph O'brien
461 Cambridge Road, Tauranga,
Address used since 23 Dec 2004 |
Director | 23 Dec 2004 - 12 May 2006 |
Bernard Lynton Gillon
Rd 1, Tauranga,
Address used since 23 Dec 2004 |
Director | 23 Dec 2004 - 01 Apr 2005 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Pricewaterhousecoopers, 109 Ward Street, Hamilton, 3240 | Registered & physical | 07 May 2014 - 07 Nov 2014 |
Pricewaterhousecoopers, Level 8, Pricewaterhousecoopers Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 08 Jun 2006 - 07 May 2014 |
Pricewaterhousecoopers, Pricewaterhousecoopers House, 188 Quay Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 13 Mar 2006 - 08 Jun 2006 |
C/-hesketh Henry, Level 11, 41 Shortland Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 26 May 2005 - 13 Mar 2006 |
C/-staples Rodway, Chartered Accountants, 132 First Avenue, Tauranga | Registered | 23 Dec 2004 - 26 May 2005 |
C/-staples Rodway, 132 First Avenue, Tauranga | Physical | 23 Dec 2004 - 26 May 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kevin Thomas Stanley Individual |
Matamata |
23 Dec 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jennian Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034903209 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Cnr Ward & Anglesea Streets Hamilton 3204 |
08 Apr 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anthony Joseph O'brien Individual |
461 Cambridge Road Tauranga |
23 Dec 2004 - 08 Apr 2005 |
Bernard Lynton Gillon Individual |
Rd 1 Tauranga |
23 Dec 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Mistry & Sons Limited Level 3, Pwc Centre |
|
Square Cheese Limited Level 3 - Pwc Centre |
|
Rgm Plant Limited Level 3, Pwc Centre |
|
Parklands Runoff Limited Level 3, Pwc Centre |
|
D J Rydon Limited Level 3, Pwc Centre |
|
Boulder Creek Hydro Limited Level 3 - Pwc Centre |