Devon Trustee Limited (NZBN 9429034869024) was registered on 22 Mar 2005. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 121 Winchester St, Christchurch, 8014 (type: registered, service). Westpac Building, 79 -81 Cashel Street, Christchurch had been their registered address, up to 23 Mar 2022. 10 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 10 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Canterbury Trustees (2004) Limited (an entity) located at Central City, Christchurch postcode 8011. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Westpac Building, 79 -81 Cashel Street, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical & service | 22 Mar 2022 |
Westpac Building, 79-81 Cashel Street, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered | 23 Mar 2022 |
121 Winchester St, Christchurch, 8014 | Registered & service | 25 Mar 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Julia Valentina Spencer
Pegasus, Pegasus, 7612
Address used since 30 Mar 2020
Hanmer Springs, 7334
Address used since 23 Mar 2018
Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 05 Mar 2012 |
Director | 22 Mar 2005 - current |
Douglas George Spencer
Pegasus, Pegasus, 7612
Address used since 30 Mar 2020
Hanmer Springs, 7334
Address used since 23 Mar 2018
Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 05 Mar 2012 |
Director | 22 Mar 2005 - current |
485 Papanui Road, Papanui , Christchurch , 8053 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Westpac Building, 79 -81 Cashel Street, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered | 22 Mar 2022 - 23 Mar 2022 |
485 Papanui Road, Papanui, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical & registered | 13 Mar 2012 - 22 Mar 2022 |
Harman & Co, 119 Armagh Street, Christchurch, Attention Mark Sherry | Registered & physical | 22 Mar 2005 - 13 Mar 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Canterbury Trustees (2004) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035565086 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Central City Christchurch 8011 |
22 Mar 2005 - current |
Munich Capital Limited 485 Papanui Road |
|
Canterbury Trustees (2010) Limited 485 Papanui Road |
|
Hume Pine (nz) Limited 485 Papanui Road |
|
Tasman Pacific Insurance Limited 485 Papanui Road |
|
Lancaster Trustees Limited 485 Papanui Road---- |
|
Wurst On The Run Limited 485 Papanui Road |