Barry O'connor Construction Limited (issued a business number of 9429034827758) was registered on 14 Apr 2005. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 16 St Andrews Square, Strowan, Christchurch, 8052 (type: registered, physical). 16 Totara St, Riccarton, Christchurch had been their physical address, up until 04 May 2006. 100 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 98 shares (98 per cent of shares), namely:
O'connor, Barry Michael (a director) located at Strowan, Christchurch postcode 8052,
O'connor, Dale (an individual) located at Christchurch postcode 8052,
Bowman, Richard Giles (an individual) located at Rd 6, Prebbleton postcode 7676. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
O'connor, Barry Michael (a director) - located at Strowan, Christchurch. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
O'connor, Dale, located at Christchurch (an individual). "Building, house construction" (business classification E301120) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Barry O'connor Construction Limited. Our database was updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
16 St Andrews Square, Strowan, Christchurch, 8052 | Registered & physical & service | 21 Mar 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Barry Michael O'connor
Strowan, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 13 Mar 2018
Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041
Address used since 23 Mar 2016 |
Director | 14 Apr 2005 - current |
Dale Jane O'connor
Riccarton, Christchurch,
Address used since 26 Apr 2006 |
Director | 14 Apr 2005 - 20 Jul 2007 |
16 St Andrews Square, Strowan , Christchurch , 8052 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
16 Totara St, Riccarton, Christchurch | Physical | 04 May 2006 - 04 May 2006 |
16 Totara Street, Riccarton, Christchurch | Registered | 04 May 2006 - 21 Mar 2018 |
16 Totara Street, Riccarton, Christchurch | Physical | 04 May 2006 - 04 May 2006 |
5 Daresbury Lane, Fendalton, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 14 Apr 2005 - 04 May 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'connor, Barry Michael Director |
Strowan Christchurch 8052 |
21 Mar 2019 - current |
O'connor, Dale Individual |
Christchurch 8052 |
21 Mar 2019 - current |
Bowman, Richard Giles Individual |
Rd 6 Prebbleton 7676 |
21 Mar 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'connor, Barry Michael Director |
Strowan Christchurch 8052 |
21 Mar 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'connor, Dale Individual |
Christchurch 8052 |
21 Mar 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Totara Assets Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030473164 Company Number: 4061802 Entity |
Christchurch Null 8041 |
12 Feb 2013 - 21 Mar 2019 |
O'connor, Barry Michael Individual |
Fendalton Christchurch 8041 |
14 Apr 2005 - 12 Feb 2013 |
O'connor, Dale Jane Individual |
Fendalton Christchurch 8041 |
14 Apr 2005 - 12 Feb 2013 |
Totara Assets Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030473164 Company Number: 4061802 Entity |
Strowan Christchurch 8052 |
12 Feb 2013 - 21 Mar 2019 |
Maximum Solutions Limited 11 St Andrews Square |
|
Maximum Space Limited 11 St Andrews Square |
|
The Tait Foundation 27 Normans Road |
|
Ali-cat Productions Limited 12 Hartley Avenue |
|
Hummingbird Coffee Charitable Trust 79 St Andrews Square |
|
The Electric Bicycle Company Limited 51 Normans Road |
J2cs Construction Limited 102 St Andrews Square |
The Bamford Building Company Limited 30 Alpha Avenue |
Mcleish Construction Limited 121 Rossall Street |
Rouse Builders Limited 101 Glandovey Road |
Nick Rogers Builder Limited 36 Jacksons Road |
Exo Construction Limited 60 Perry Street |