Chapman Manufacturing (2006) Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429034769881) was registered on 27 May 2005. 9 addresess are in use by the company: 15 Vanadium Place, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 (type: office, delivery). 52 Cashel Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch had been their physical address, up until 27 Oct 2016. 15000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 14850 shares (99% of shares), namely:
Chapman, Christopher David (an individual) located at Saint Albans, Christchurch postcode 8052,
Withell, David James (an individual) located at Prebbleton, Prebbleton postcode 7604. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (150 shares); it includes
Chapman, Christopher David (an individual) - located at Saint Albans, Christchurch. Our information was last updated on 25 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit 13, 1 Stark Drive, Wigram, Christchurch, 8042 | Service & physical & registered | 27 Oct 2016 |
Po Box 80113, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8440 | Postal | 14 Nov 2019 |
19a Marylands Place, Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 | Office & delivery & invoice | 14 Nov 2019 |
15 Vanadium Place, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Office & delivery & invoice | 06 Nov 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
James Alexander Chapman
West Melton, Christchurch, 7618
Address used since 19 Nov 2015 |
Director | 27 May 2005 - current |
Joan Audrey Chapman
West Melton, Christchurch, 7618
Address used since 19 Nov 2015 |
Director | 27 May 2005 - current |
Christopher David Chapman
Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 05 Nov 2010 |
Director | 27 May 2005 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
15 Vanadium Place, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Office & delivery & invoice | 06 Nov 2023 |
19a Marylands Place , Middleton , Christchurch , 8024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
52 Cashel Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical & registered | 02 May 2013 - 27 Oct 2016 |
Sauer & Stanley Limited, 79 Kilmore Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 27 May 2005 - 02 May 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chapman, Christopher David Individual |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8052 |
27 May 2005 - current |
Withell, David James Individual |
Prebbleton Prebbleton 7604 |
27 May 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chapman, Christopher David Individual |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8052 |
27 May 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chapman, James Alexander Individual |
West Melton Christchurch 7618 |
27 May 2005 - 02 Oct 2017 |
Chapman, James Alexander Individual |
West Melton Christchurch 7618 |
27 May 2005 - 02 Oct 2017 |
Chapman, Joan Audrey Individual |
West Melton Christchurch 7618 |
27 May 2005 - 02 Oct 2017 |
Chapman, Joan Audrey Individual |
West Melton Christchurch 7618 |
27 May 2005 - 02 Oct 2017 |
Original Foods N.z. Limited 8 Stark Drive |
|
Eeny Meeny Trust Limited 5 Stark Drive |
|
Prestons Rd Landscape Supplies Limited Unit 13, 1 Stark Drive |
|
Longfield Stud Limited Unit 13, 1 Stark Drive |
|
Cranleigh Fields Limited Unit 13, 1 Stark Drive |
|
The Globe Supply Company Limited Unit 13, 1 Stark Drive |